EP3893893 - METHODS FOR IMPROVING EXERCISE TOLERANCE IN MYALGIC ENCEPHALOMYELITIS PATIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIM ImmunoTech Inc. 2117 SW Highway 484 Ocala, FL 34473 / US | [2023/26] |
Former [2021/42] | For all designated states Aim Immunotech Inc. 2117 SW Highway 484 Ocala FL 34473 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRAYER, David, R. c/o AIM Immunotech Inc. 2117 SW Highway 484 Ocala, FL 34473 / US | 02 /
YOUNG, Diane, L. c/o AIM Immunotech Inc. 2117 SW Highway 484 Ocala, FL 34473 / US | 03 /
EQUELS, Thomas, K. c/o AIM Immunotech Inc. 2117 SW Highway 484 Ocala, FL 34473 / US | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19827888.9 | 25.11.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019US63048 | Priority number, date | US201862778935P | 13.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862778935 P | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020123136 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3893893 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/713, A61P25/00 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
A61K31/713 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/61 (KR,US);
A61K47/645 (KR,US);
A61P21/06 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP,KR);
G01N33/48 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER TRAININGSTOLERANZ BEI PATIENTEN MIT ENCEPHALOMYELITIS | [2021/42] | English: | METHODS FOR IMPROVING EXERCISE TOLERANCE IN MYALGIC ENCEPHALOMYELITIS PATIENTS | [2021/42] | French: | MÉTHODES POUR AMÉLIORER LA TOLÉRANCE À L'EFFORT CHEZ DES PATIENTS ATTEINTS D'UNE ENCÉPHALOMYÉLITE MYALGIQUE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 01.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2010042229 (HEMISPHERX BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2010104571 (HEMISPHERX BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-16* the whole document *; | [I]WO2015010022 (HEMISPHERX BIOPHARMA INC [US]) [I] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [I] - WILLIAM M MITCHELL, "Efficacy of rintatolimod in the treatment of chronic fatigue syndrome/myalgic encephalomyelitis (CFS/ME)", EXPERT REVIEW OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY 20141101 EXPERT REVIEWS LTD. GBR, UK, (20160525), vol. 9, no. 6, doi:10.1586/17512433.2016.1172960, ISSN 1751-2433, pages 755 - 770, XP055556867 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/17512433.2016.1172960 | by applicant | US4024222 | US4130641 | US5258369 | US8722874 | US9315538 |