EP3871182 - GPU CALCULATION OF SIGNED DISTANCE FIELDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUENIOT, Alexandre MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
KIKOEN, Cameron David MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
APODACA ARAGON, Gilberto Aristides MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | Townsend, Martyn Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 19827978.8 | 29.11.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019US63825 | Priority number, date | US201816213525 | 07.12.2018 Original published format: US201816213525 | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020117613 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3871182 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/20, G06T11/20 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
G06T11/203 (EP);
G06T11/001 (EP,US);
G06T2210/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | GPU-BERECHNUNG SIGNIERTER DISTANZFELDER | [2021/35] | English: | GPU CALCULATION OF SIGNED DISTANCE FIELDS | [2021/35] | French: | CALCUL PAR GPU DE CHAMPS DE DISTANCE SIGNÉS | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 25.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2004189642 (FRISKEN SARAH F [US], et al) [X] 1,3,11,13 * paragraphs [1118] - [0124] - [0132] - [0138]; figures 21A-21D,23 * [A] 4,5,7,8,10,14,15 [I] 2,6,9,12; | [A]US2012249569 (KOKOJIMA YOSHIYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |