EP3898404 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR LOCATING AN OBJECT IN OR BELOW A BODY OF WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GmbH Sebaldsbrücker Heerstraße 235 28309 Bremen / DE | For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALTOFEN, Tommy Kirchbachstraße 122 28211 Bremen / DE | 02 /
KALWA, Jörg Habichtweg 50 28844 Weyhe / DE | 03 /
PREU, Benedict Timmersloher Strasse 54 28215 Bremen / DE | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19828635.3 | 13.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019EP85004 | Priority number, date | DE201810222487 | 20.12.2018 Original published format: DE102018222487 | [2021/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020126867 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3898404 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B63G7/06, G01S7/539, G01S15/06, G01S15/88, G01V3/08 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
B63G7/06 (EP);
G01V3/08 (EP);
G01V3/081 (EP);
B63G2007/065 (EP);
G01S15/08 (EP);
G01S15/876 (EP);
G01S15/88 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM LOKALISIEREN EINES GEGENSTANDS IN ODER UNTER EINEM GEWÄSSER | [2021/43] | English: | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR LOCATING AN OBJECT IN OR BELOW A BODY OF WATER | [2021/43] | French: | ARRANGEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LOCALISER UN OBJET DANS OU SOUS UNE MASSE D'EAU | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 20.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0010331 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-15* page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 22; figures 1-3,8 *; | [Y]US5425001 (POLVANI DONALD G [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 49; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2010132538 (THEOBALD ALAN [AU], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0040] - [0044]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2014165898 (CIERPKA KAI [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0079] - [0083] - [0089] - [0092] - [0101] - [0104]; figures 1-6 * |