EP3820043 - STEP MOTOR DRIVING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi, Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKYOH, Yu c/o Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12, Tanashicho 6- chome Nishitokyo-shi, Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/19] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19830398.4 | 21.06.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019JP24760 | Priority number, date | JP20180126055 | 02.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018126055 | [2021/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020008918 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3820043 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02P8/02, G04C3/14 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
G04C3/143 (EP,US);
H02P6/182 (US);
H02P8/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | SCHRITTMOTORANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/19] | English: | STEP MOTOR DRIVING DEVICE | [2021/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE MOTEUR PAS À PAS | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2020 | Translation filed | 28.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 29.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2487549 (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0008] , [00 9] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0059] * * paragraphs [0077] - [0082]; figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP2538285 (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0068] - [0078] * * figures 6, 7 *; | [X]EP3203329 (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0031] - [0044] * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0059] - [0074] * * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0075] - [0126] * * figures 5-7 *; | [X]US2017261939 (HOSOBUCHI HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0027] - [0038] * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0103] * * figures 3-5 ** paragraphs [0125] - [0127]; figure 6 * | International search | [A]JP2009213221 (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , *; | [A]JP2016003877 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-11 * , *; | [A]JP2016170019 (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-11* , * | by applicant | JP2016003877 |