EP3815950 - VEHICLE TRANSMISSION APPARATUS AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Fengchun No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
HUA, Yu No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Anxin No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 04 /
TANG, Tingyu No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Jing No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19831281.1 | 03.07.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019CN94549 | Priority number, date | CN201810726590 | 04.07.2018 Original published format: CN201810726590 | [2021/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020007318 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3815950 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/08, B60K7/00, B60K17/04 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
B60K17/08 (EP,CN,KR);
B60K17/046 (EP,US);
B60K17/043 (EP,KR);
F16H1/32 (KR,US);
F16H57/02 (KR,US);
B60K2007/0038 (US);
B60K2007/0061 (EP);
B60Y2200/1432 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | B60K17/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGGETRIEBEVORRICHTUNG UND FAHRZEUG | [2021/18] | English: | VEHICLE TRANSMISSION APPARATUS AND VEHICLE | [2021/18] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE VÉHICULE, ET VÉHICULE | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2021 | Translation filed | 26.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 11.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6035956 (MAURER DIETER [DE], et al); | [XA]CN1495060 (AWENMAYSH TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [X]DE102005017722 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]); | [XI]CN104908579 (JASMIN INT AUTO RES & DEVELOPMENT BEIJING CO LTD) | International search | [X]GB2080747 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN) [X] 1-4, 15, 16; | [X]US6035956 (MAURER DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-4, 15, 16; | [XY]CN1495060 (AWENMAYSH TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1-4, 15, 16 [Y] 5-14; | [Y]CN104908579 (JASMIN INT AUTO RES & DEVELOPMENT BEIJING CO LTD) [Y] 5-14; | [A]CN206589668U (GREAT WALL MOTOR CO LTD)[A] 1-16; | [PX]CN109177726 (HUNAN NONGFU ELECTROMECHANICAL CO LTD) [PX] 1-4, 15, 16 |