EP3818373 - CAPLESS SAMPLE WELL PORT FOR A CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zomedica Biotechnologies LLC 100 Phoenix Drive, Suite 190 Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | [2024/28] |
Former [2021/19] | For all designated states Qorvo US, Inc. 7628 Thorndike Road Greensboro, NC 27409 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBSTER, James Russell 3806 Victoria Street Minnetonka, Minnesota 55345 / US | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/19] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19831388.4 | 25.06.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019US38983 | Priority number, date | US201862694508P | 06.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862694508 P | US201816146108 | 28.09.2018 Original published format: US201816146108 | [2021/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020009839 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3818373 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, A23L33/00, B01L3/00, B81B3/00, G01D18/00, G01N1/00 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
B01L3/5027 (EP);
B01L3/502746 (US);
B01L3/502707 (US);
B01L3/502723 (US);
B01L3/502738 (US);
G01N35/1095 (US);
B01L2200/027 (EP);
B01L2200/0605 (EP);
B01L2300/0681 (EP);
B01L2300/0809 (EP,US);
B01L2300/14 (US);
B01L2300/161 (EP);
B01L2400/0406 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0688 (EP);
B01L2400/0694 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | DECKELLOSER PROBENVERTIEFUNGSPORT FÜR EINE KASSETTE | [2021/19] | English: | CAPLESS SAMPLE WELL PORT FOR A CARTRIDGE | [2021/19] | French: | ORIFICE DE PUITS D'ÉCHANTILLON SANS CAPUCHON POUR CARTOUCHE | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2012127050 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM MICROPART [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2016019113 (SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS [US]); | [X]WO2018026970 (QORVO US INC [US]) | International search | [Y]US2003037611 (PURPURA PAUL E [US], et al); | [Y]US2007245810 (CARTER CHAD J [US], et al); | [Y]US2015132860 (COOK RICHARD ALAN [US], et al) |