EP3733927 - FILM FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMEIC Corporation 3-1-1 Kyobashi Chuo-Ku Tokyo 1040031 / JP | [2024/25] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1, Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAMATSU, Takahiro c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1 Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 1040031 / JP | 02 /
ORITA, Hiroyuki c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1 Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 1040031 / JP | 03 /
NAMITO, Nobuyoshi c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1 Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 1040031 / JP | 04 /
IWAO, Yusuke c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1 Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 1040031 / JP | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2024/25] |
Former [2020/45] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 19832537.5 | 28.02.2019 | [2020/45] | WO2019JP07748 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020174642 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3733927 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3733927 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3733927 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455, B05D3/02, H01L31/18, C23C14/56 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
H01L31/18 (EP,US);
C23C16/4486 (EP,KR);
C23C16/4582 (EP,KR,US);
B05D1/02 (EP,US);
B05D3/0227 (KR,US);
B05D3/0263 (EP,US);
C23C16/0209 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45574 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45595 (EP,KR);
C23C16/46 (EP);
C23C16/482 (US);
C23C16/54 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/56 (EP,US);
B05B9/00 (US);
B05D1/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/45] | C23C16/455, B05D3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILMFORMUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/45] | English: | FILM FORMING DEVICE | [2020/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION DE FILM | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2020 | Translation filed | 16.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4261808 (WALTER HEINZ); | [A]US2011265725 (TSUJI NORIHIKO [JP], et al); | [XI]CN102615010 (DONGGUAN BAIJIN HARDWARE PLASTICS CO LTD); | [A]WO2017187500 (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) | International search | DE2844491 [ ] (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG); | [Y]JPS5554569 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS VERWALTUNG); | US4261808 [ ] (WALTER HEINZ); | [A]JP2010077508 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD); | KR20110058909 [ ] (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP]); | CN102165100 [ ] (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD); | US2011265725 [ ] (TSUJI NORIHIKO [JP], et al); | [XYA]CN102615010 (DONGGUAN BAIJIN HARDWARE PLASTICS CO LTD); | TW201739020 [ ] (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2017187503 (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]); | KR20180104130 [ ] (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]); | CN108699681 [ ] (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORP ) | by applicant | WO2017068625 |