EP4078107 - MEASURING DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A FILLING LEVEL OR LIMIT LEVEL OF A PRODUCT IN A CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR FILLING OR EMPTYING A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/43] | MEASURING APPARATUS FOR DETECTING A FILL LEVEL OR LIMIT LEVEL OF A FILLING MATERIAL IN A CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR FILLING OR EMPTYING A CONTAINER WITH OR OF A FILLING MATERIAL | ||
[2024/07] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEGA Grieshaber KG Hauptstr. 1 - 5 77709 Wolfach / DE | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENGSTLER, Clemens Steinacher Strasse 3 77716 Haslach / DE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstraße 87 50968 Köln / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 19832668.8 | 19.12.2019 | [2022/43] | WO2019EP86397 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021121605 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4078107 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4078107 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G01F23/00 (EP);
G01F23/80 (KR,US);
G01F23/0007 (KR);
G01F23/22 (KR,US);
G01F25/24 (US);
G01D2218/10 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG EINES FÜLL- ODER GRENZSTANDS EINES FÜLLGUTS IN EINEM BEHÄLTER SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BEFÜLLEN ODER ENTLEEREN EINES BEHÄLTERS MIT BZW. VON EINEM FÜLLGUT | [2022/43] | English: | MEASURING DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A FILLING LEVEL OR LIMIT LEVEL OF A PRODUCT IN A CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR FILLING OR EMPTYING A CONTAINER | [2024/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE POUR DÉTERMINER UN NIVEAU DE REMPLISSAGE OU UN NIVEAU LIMITE D'UN PRODUIT DANS UN RÉCIPIENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR REMPLIR OU VIDER UN RÉCIPIENT | [2024/07] |
Former [2022/43] | MEASURING APPARATUS FOR DETECTING A FILL LEVEL OR LIMIT LEVEL OF A FILLING MATERIAL IN A CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR FILLING OR EMPTYING A CONTAINER WITH OR OF A FILLING MATERIAL | ||
Former [2022/43] | APPAREIL DE MESURE PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER UN NIVEAU DE REMPLISSAGE OU UN NIVEAU LIMITE D'UN MATÉRIAU DE REMPLISSAGE DANS UN RÉCIPIENT ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE REMPLIR UN RÉCIPIENT AVEC UN MATÉRIAU DE REMPLISSAGE OU DE LE VIDER DE CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 12.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US6192752 (BLAINE DAVID [US]); | [XI]US2010106446 (ASHRAFZADEH FARHAD [US], et al); | [XI]EP2256566 (GRIESHABER VEGA KG [DE]); | [XI]US2016116324 (JOB CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al); | [XI]DE202019001575U (CEMO GMBH [DE]) |