EP4066087 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CHARACTERISING A MOVEMENT OF A MOVING ENTITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST37 Sport et Technologie 11 Avenue Lamartine 64110 Jurançon / FR | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINEDA CORDERO, Carlos Javier 11 avenue Lamartine 64110 Jurançon / FR | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | A.P.I. Conseil Immeuble Newton 4, rue Jules Ferry 64000 Pau / FR | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 19832717.3 | 03.11.2019 | [2022/40] | WO2019FR52591 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021084165 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4066087 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, A63B24/00, G06T7/20 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06T7/246 (EP);
G06V40/23 (EP);
G06T2207/30221 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM CHARAKTERISIEREN EINER BEWEGUNG EINER SICH BEWEGENDEN EINHEIT | [2022/40] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CHARACTERISING A MOVEMENT OF A MOVING ENTITY | [2022/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CARACTERISATION D'UN MOUVEMENT D'UNE ENTITE EN MOUVEMENT | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/40] | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2022/40] | 17.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 17.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees RS, HU, AT, AL, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE | 17.08.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2022 | Decision despatched | 17.08.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 17.08.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 17.08.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.06.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.08.2022 | 30.11.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2023 | 30.11.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009220124 (SIEGEL FRED [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0077]; figure 91- * [I] 1-15; | [XI]US2012214594 (KIROVSKI DARKO [US], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0145]; figures 1A-13 * [I] 1-15; | [XI] - JEONGEUN SHIN ET AL, "A study on motion analysis of an artistic gymnastics by using dynamic image processing - for a development of automatic scoring system of horizontal bar -", 2008 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS : SMC ; SINGAPORE, 12 - 15 OCTOBER 2008, Piscataway, NJ, US, (20080515), doi:10.1109/ICSMC.2008.4811418, ISBN 978-1-4244-2383-5, pages 1037 - 1042, XP055617277 [X] 1,4,15 * the whole document * [I] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSMC.2008.4811418 | by applicant | EP1910977 | US9665804 | US2017193284 | US9811732 | US9836852 | US9852511 | US9865062 | KR20180079894 | KR20180109227 | WO2019107641 | US2019213400 | EP3528207 |