EP3821361 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING SYNTHETICALLY ANONYMIZED DATA FOR A GIVEN TASK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imagia Cybernetics Inc. 6650, rue St-Urbain Suite 100 Montréal, Québec H2S 3G9 / CA | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDELIER, Florent 1245 chemin du Lac Saint-Louis Lery Québec J6N 1A9 / CA | 02 /
JESSON, Andrew 802, Avenue Dollard, Apt. 5 Outremont Québec H2V 337 / CA | 03 /
HAVAEI, Mohammad 4-2945 chemin Bedford Montréal, Québec H3S 1G3 / CA | 04 /
DIJORIO, Lisa 4593 Cartier Montréal, Québec H2H 1W9 / CA | 05 /
LOW-KAM, Cecile 4593 Cartier Montréal, Québec H2H 1W9 / CA | 06 /
CHAPADOS, Nicolas 7081 Christophe Colomb Montréal, Québec H2S 2H4 / CA | 07 /
SOUDAN, Florian 5838, av de Chateaubriand Montréal, Québec H2S 2N2 / CA | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19833256.1 | 12.07.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019IB55972 | Priority number, date | US201862697804P | 13.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862697804 P | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020012439 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821361 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16H10/60, G06F21/62, G06N3/02 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
G06F21/6254 (EP,KR,US);
F16D65/22 (IL);
B60T11/18 (IL);
F16D65/0056 (IL);
G06F21/79 (KR);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/088 (EP);
G16H10/60 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/20] | G06F21/60, G16H10/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON SYNTHETISCH ANONYMISIERTEN DATEN FÜR EINE BESTIMMTE AUFGABE | [2021/20] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING SYNTHETICALLY ANONYMIZED DATA FOR A GIVEN TASK | [2021/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION DE DONNÉES SYNTHÉTIQUEMENT ANONYMISÉES POUR UNE TÂCHE DONNÉE | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 07.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 20.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - Edward Choi ET AL, "Proceedings of Machine Learning for Healthcare 2017 JMLR W&C Track Volume 68 Generating Multi-label Discrete Patient Records using Generative Adversarial Networks", (20180111), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1703.06490.pdf, (20200305), XP055674157 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - BRILAND HITAJ ET AL, "Deep Models Under the GAN : Information Leakage from Collaborative Deep Learning", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2017 ACM SIGSAC CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SECURITY , CCS '17, New York, New York, USA, (20171030), doi:10.1145/3133956.3134012, ISBN 978-1-4503-4946-8, pages 603 - 618, XP055536296 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3133956.3134012 | International search | [A]US2018165475 (VEERAMACHANENI KALYAN KUMAR [US], et al) [A] 1-12*whole document*; | [A] - CHOI, E. et al., "Generating Multi-label Discrete Patient Records using Generative Adversarial Networks", arXiv:1703.06490v3 [cs.LG, (20180111), page 20, XP055674157 [A] 1-12 *whole document* | [A] - XIE, L. et al., "Differentially Private Generative Adversarial Network", arXiv:1802.06739vl [cs.LG, (20180219), page 9, XP081216601 [A] 1-12 *whole document* | [A] - ACS, G. et al., "Differentially Private Mixture of Generative Neural Networks", arXiv:1709.04514vl [cs.LG, (20170913), page 11, XP033279252 [A] 1-12 *whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDM.2017.81 | [A] - Jamie Hayes, Melis Luca, Danezis George, De Cristofaro Emiliano, "LOGAN: Evaluating Privacy Leakage of Generative Models Using Generative Adversarial Networks", arXiv, (20170501), pages 1 - 18, XP055768176 [A] 1-12 *whole document* | [A] - HITAJ, B. et al., "Deep Models Under the GAN: Information Leakage from Collaborative Deep Learning", Proceedings of the 2017 ACM SIGSAC Conference on Computer and Communications Security, CCS '17, Dallas, Texas, USA, (20171030), doi:10.1145/3133956.3134012, pages 603 - 618, XP055536296 [A] 1-12 *whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3133956.3134012 | by applicant | - CHOI et al., "Proceedings of Machine Learning for Healthcare", 2017 JMLR W&C Track, vol. 68, (20180111), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1703.06490.pdf, XP055674157 | - HITAJ et al., "Proceedings Of The 2017 Acm Sigsac Conference On Computer And Communications Security", CCS '17, (20171030), pages 603 - 618 | - "Towards Safe Deep Learning: Unsupervised Defense Against Generic Adversarial Attacks", OpenReview HyI6s40a | - "conditional generative adversarial nets", arXiv: 1411.1784 | - "Generative adversarial text to image synthesis", arXiv:1605.05396 | - "RenderGAN: generating realistic labelled data", arXiv: 1611.01331 | - "Privacy-preserving generative deep neural networks support clinical data sharing", bioarxkiv: 159756 | - "Generating differentially private datasets using GANs", OpenReview rJv4XWZA-, ICLR 2018 | - "What uncertainties do we need in Bayesian deep learning for computer vision?", Advances in Neural Information Processing Systems, (20170000), vol. 30, pages 5580 - 5590 |