EP3822221 - CRANE AND CRANE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TADANO LTD. Ko-34, Shinden-cho Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa 761-0185 / JP | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINAMI Yoshimasa c/o TADANO LTD., Ko-34, Shinden-cho Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa 761-0185 / JP | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19833325.4 | 04.07.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019JP26622 | Priority number, date | JP20180129966 | 09.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018129966 | [2021/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020013071 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822221 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3822221 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B66C13/22, B66C23/42 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
B66C23/88 (EP);
B66C13/105 (US);
B66C13/22 (US);
B66C13/42 (EP);
B66C13/46 (EP,US);
B66C13/48 (EP);
B66C2700/088 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAN UND KRANSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/20] | English: | CRANE AND CRANE CONTROL METHOD | [2021/20] | French: | GRUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE GRUE | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2020 | Translation filed | 30.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 12.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07101672 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH08333086 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-3* paragraph [0088]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]JP2006525928 [A] 1-3; | [A]JP2007254082 (LIEBHERR WERK NENZING) [A] 1-3; | [A]JP2010228905 (TADANO LTD) [A] 1-3; | [A]JP2013184826 (LIEBHERR WERK NENZING)[A] 1-3 | by applicant | JP2010228905 |