EP3806406 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OBTAINING INFORMATION OF FORWARDING PATH OF DATA PACKET IN SEGMENT ROUTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Cheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
PREVIDI, Stefano Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Guoyi Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19834260.2 | 23.06.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019CN92446 | Priority number, date | CN201810744644 | 09.07.2018 Original published format: CN201810744644 | [2021/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020010999 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3806406 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3806406 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/12, H04L45/02, H04L45/50, H04L45/00, H04L69/04 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
H04L45/12 (EP,US);
H04L45/34 (EP,CN,US);
H04L45/1287 (US);
H04L45/02 (EP,CN,US);
H04L45/04 (EP,US);
H04L45/24 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | H04L12/721, H04L12/715, H04L12/723, H04L29/06, H04L12/751 | ||
Former IPC [2021/15] | H04L12/721 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEWINNUNG VON INFORMATIONEN ÜBER DEN WEITERLEITUNGSPFAD EINES DATENPAKETS IN EINER SEGMENTLEITWEGLENKUNG | [2021/15] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OBTAINING INFORMATION OF FORWARDING PATH OF DATA PACKET IN SEGMENT ROUTING | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR DES INFORMATIONS DE CHEMIN D'ACHEMINEMENT DE PAQUET DE DONNÉES DANS LE ROUTAGE DE SEGMENT | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2021 | Translation filed | 08.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 12.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014269422 (FILSFILS CLARENCE [BE], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9,12-15 * paragraphs [0036] , [0038] , [0 49] , [0 53] , [0054] , [0 44]; figures 1-3 * [I] 2,3,8,10,11; | [A]US9537769 (BRYANT STEWART F [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 5a, 5b * | International search | [A]CN105850082 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]CN105871721 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-18 * description, paragraphs 0052-0074 *; | [A]WO2017198319 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [A] 1-18* entire document *; | [A]CN108156077 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-18 * entire document * |