EP3822915 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA ENCODING METHOD, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA DECODING METHOD, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA ENCODING DEVICE, AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA DECODING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Chung Dean c/o Panasonic R&D Center Singapore 202 Bedok South Avenue 1 No. 02-11 Singapore 469332 / SG | 02 /
LASANG, Pongsak c/o Panasonic R&D Center Singapore 202 Bedok South Avenue 1 No. 02-11 Singapore 469332 / SG | 03 /
WANG, Chi c/o Panasonic R&D Center Singapore 202 Bedok South Avenue 1 No. 02-11 Singapore 469332 / SG | 04 /
IGUCHI, Noritaka c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
SUGIO, Toshiyasu c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19834420.2 | 10.07.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019JP27401 | Priority number, date | US201862697598P | 13.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862697598 P | [2021/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020013249 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822915 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T9/00 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
G06T9/40 (EP);
H04N19/597 (KR,US);
G06T9/00 (KR);
G06T9/001 (EP);
H04N19/176 (KR);
H04N19/184 (EP,KR);
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER DATEN, VERFAHREN ZUR DECODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER DATEN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR CODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER DATEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DECODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER DATEN | [2021/20] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA ENCODING METHOD, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA DECODING METHOD, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA ENCODING DEVICE, AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA DECODING DEVICE | [2021/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE DE DONNÉES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE DE DONNÉES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES, DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE DE DONNÉES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE DE DONNÉES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2021 | Translation filed | 04.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 18.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CA3005713 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]); | [E]EP3792875 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]); | International search | [A]JP2006187015 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]JP2014527735 ; | [A]JP2014529950 ; | [A]JP2015505389 ; | [A]WO2018083999 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) | by applicant | WO2014020663 |