EP3804418 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MULTI-ANTENNA TRANSMISSION IN VEHICLE TO VEHICLE COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Li 665 Clyde Ave. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19834460.8 | 11.07.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019KR08591 | Priority number, date | US201862696686P | 11.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862696686 P | US201862764842P | 16.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862764842 P | US201862719788P | 20.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862719788 P | US201862729128P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729128 P | US201862734472P | 21.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862734472 P | US201862750965P | 26.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862750965 P | US201862754269P | 01.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862754269 P | US201862783472P | 21.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862783472 P | US201916508204 | 10.07.2019 Original published format: US201916508204 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020013641 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3804418 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/24, H04W52/32, H04W24/10, H04W52/38, H04W52/42, H04W72/04, H04W4/40, H04W92/18, H04W52/34 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
H04W52/146 (EP);
H04W52/241 (US);
H04B17/327 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP);
H04L1/0029 (EP);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W52/242 (EP);
H04W52/26 (US);
H04W52/346 (EP);
H04W52/383 (EP);
H04W76/14 (EP,US);
H04W92/18 (EP,US);
H04L1/1861 (EP);
H04L1/20 (EP);
H04L5/005 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | H04W52/24, H04W52/32, H04W24/10, H04W52/38, H04W52/42, H04W72/04, H04W4/40, H04W92/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MEHRANTENNENÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINER FAHRZEUG-ZU-FAHRZEUG-KOMMUNIKATION | [2021/15] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MULTI-ANTENNA TRANSMISSION IN VEHICLE TO VEHICLE COMMUNICATION | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA TRANSMISSION MULTI-ANTENNE DANS UNE COMMUNICATION VÉHICULE À VÉHICULE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 16.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/31] | 28.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/31] | Divisional application(s) | EP22216246.3 / EP4178277 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3225044 (MIAO GUOWANG [US]); | [YA]US2017367056 (WEI YUXIN [CN]); | International search | [A]US2013171955 (MAKHLOUF ISAM R [US], et al); | [A]KR20160097111 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]WO2016182293 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]US2017064571 (KUSASHIMA NAOKI [JP], et al); | [AY]KR20180063265 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | EP3225044 | US2017367056 |