EP3821385 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR BIOMETRIC CARD ENROLLMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastercard International Incorporated 2000 Purchase Street Purchase, NY 10577 / US | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOSKOWITZ, Ellen 6 West Glen Avenue Port Chester, NY 10573 / US | 02 /
KAMAL, Ashfaq 42 Fox Ridge Road Stamford, CT 06903 / US | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19835167.8 | 07.06.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019US35930 | Priority number, date | US201816030315 | 09.07.2018 Original published format: US201816030315 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020013931 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821385 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/30, G06Q20/40, G06F21/32 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
G06Q20/40145 (EP);
G06Q20/105 (US);
G06K19/0728 (US);
G06Q20/341 (US);
G06Q20/352 (US);
G06Q20/3552 (EP);
G06Q20/3563 (US);
G06Q20/3567 (EP);
G06Q20/3672 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR AUFNAHME BIOMETRISCHER KARTEN | [2021/20] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR BIOMETRIC CARD ENROLLMENT | [2021/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR INSCRIPTION À UNE CARTE BIOMÉTRIQUE | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005263596 (NELSON CRAIG R [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US2015127553 (SUNDARAM MOHAN [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0 32] , [0 50] , [0 80] *; | [Y]US2016267486 (MITRA RAJESHWAR D [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraphs [0050] , [0070] , [0076] *; | [Y]US2016364730 (RANS JEAN-PAUL EDMOND [BE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] , [0036] , [0040] , [0055] , [0073] * | International search | [A]US2013311372 (RAMACI JONATHAN E [US])[A] 1-24; | [A]US2016104151 (TUNNELL ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-24; | [X]US2016267486 (MITRA RAJESHWAR D [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * , abstract, paragraphs [0012]-[0015], [0045], [0048], [0050], [0052]-[0058], [0061], [0063], [0066], [0070], [0073], [0089], [0107], [0134], [0144], fig. 5B *; | [A]US9519901 (DOROGUSKER JESSE [US]) [A] 1-24 | by applicant | US2016364730 |