EP3821237 - ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETER WITH CENTER ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benner, W. Henry 3240 Blackhawk Meadow Dr. Danville, CA 94506 / US | For all designated states Bogan, Michael, J. 411 Granite Street Pacific Grove CA 93950 / US | For all designated states Aguilar, Ben 843 Hawthorne St., 20 Monterey CA 93940 / US | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Lusinchi, Laurent Pierre Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19835183.5 | 10.07.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019US41253 | Priority number, date | US201862696162P | 10.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862696162 P | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020014396 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821237 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/62, H01J49/00 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
G01N27/622 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | IONENMOBILITÄTSSPEKTROMETER MIT MITTIGEM STAB | [2021/20] | English: | ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETER WITH CENTER ROD | [2021/20] | French: | SPECTROMÈTRE DE MOBILITÉ IONIQUE AVEC TIGE CENTRALE | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 30.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3986111 (SELLERS BACH) [X] 1,2,5,6,8-10 * column 3, lines 38-53 * * column 4, lines 43-48 * * figure 1 * * column 2, lines 32-50 * [I] 3,4,11-15; | [I]US4831254 (JENKINS ANTHONY [GB]) [I] 1-15 * column 1, lines 38-65; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 6-15 *; | [A]GB2395355 (MICROMASS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2a, 2b * * page 15, line 1 - page 19, line 16 *; | [A]US2006219889 (SHVARTSBURG ALEXANDRE A [US], et al) [A] 1-15* columns 41-45; figure 4 * | International search | [Y]US2005109930 (HILL HERBERT H JR [US], et al) [Y] 1-53 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0079] and figures 1-5. *; | [Y]US2008142697 (DAHL DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 1-53 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0053] and figures 1, 3, 4. *; | [A]JP2016079780 (UEMATSU MIKI) [A] 1-53 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0059] and figures 1-8. *; | [Y]US2017263427 (BENNER W HENRY [US]) [Y] 10, 11, 26, 37, 38, 52 * See paragraphs [0061], [0062] and figure 2A. *; | [A]US2017299551 (ZALESKI HENRYK [CA], et al) [A] 1-53* See paragraphs [0033]-[0049] and figures 3, 4, 7. * |