EP3886556 - PRESS WHEEL FOR AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT, ROW UNIT COMPRISING SUCH PRESS WHEEL. AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT, AND METHOD OF SETTING HARDNESS OF PRESS WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Väderstad Holding AB P.O. Box 167 590 21 Väderstad / SE | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLIN, Morgan Bockarpsvägen 8 595 51 Mjölby / SE | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19835322.9 | 29.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019SE51209 | Priority number, date | SE20180051497 | 30.11.2018 Original published format: SE 1851497 | [2021/40] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020112015 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3886556 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01C5/06 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
A01C5/068 (EP,SE,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | PRESSRAD FÜR LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES GERÄT, REIHENEINHEIT MIT SOLCH EINEM PRESSRAD LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER HÄRTE DES PRESSRADES | [2021/40] | English: | PRESS WHEEL FOR AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT, ROW UNIT COMPRISING SUCH PRESS WHEEL. AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT, AND METHOD OF SETTING HARDNESS OF PRESS WHEEL | [2021/40] | French: | ROUE DE PRESSE POUR UN OUTIL AGRICOLE, UNITÉ DE RANGÉE COMPRENANT UNE TELLE ROUE DE PRESSE OUTIL AGRICOLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE LA DURETÉ D'UNE ROUE DE PRESSE | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 31.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2386197 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 17,21 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 11,12,14,15; | [XI]EP2982229 (OTICO [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-12,14,15 * abstract * * page 6, paragraphs 45, 46,48,51 * * page 7, paragraphs 60, 62-64 * * page 8, paragraphs 64-66 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 5,9,13,16,17; | [A]EP3207784 (HORSCH MASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 4, paragraphs 23,25 * * page 5, paragraphs 25,29 ** figure -; claim - * |