EP3894782 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF OBJECTS ON A CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FT System S.r.l. Via L. Da Vinci, 117 29010 Alseno (PC) / IT | [2023/40] |
Former [2021/42] | For all designated states Ft System S.r.l. Via L. Da Vinci 117 29010 Alseno (PC) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIPRIANI, Marco Via Pietre 97 10091 Alpignano (TO) / IT | 02 /
PAGLIA, Michele Via Derna 10 43125 Parma / IT | 03 /
ORSO, Eric Via Montegrappa 7 10063 Perosa Argentina (TO) / IT | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19835734.5 | 12.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019IB60694 | Priority number, date | IT20180011042 | 12.12.2018 Original published format: IT201800011042 | [2021/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020121235 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3894782 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3894782 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02, G01B11/06, G01B11/24 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
G01B11/028 (EP,US);
G01B11/0608 (EP,US);
G01B11/2433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION VON GEGENSTÄNDEN AUF EINEM FÖRDERER | [2021/42] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF OBJECTS ON A CONVEYOR | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR DÉTERMINER LA POSITION D'OBJETS SUR UN TRANSPORTEUR | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 06.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0577950 (ELPATRONIC AG [CH]) [Y] 4,9 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 19 ** column 2, line 25 - line 31 *; | [Y]DE19710913 (KRONSEDER MASCHF KRONES [DE]) [Y] 4,9 * column 3, line 47 - line 56; figure 2 * * column 4, line 20 - line 26 *; | [XYI]US5979635 (CALHOUN FRED L [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10 * abstract; column 5, line 2 - line 28; figures 1,4,6 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 43 * [Y] 4,9 [I] 5 |