EP3898877 - ELASTOMER-DERIVED CERAMIC STRUCTURES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIVOT, Maiken 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
BEIERMANN, Brett A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19835793.1 | 17.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019IB60952 | Priority number, date | US201862780955P | 18.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862780955 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020128856 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3898877 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/14, B24D3/00, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/10, B28B11/24 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
B28B1/001 (EP,US);
C09K3/1436 (US);
B24D3/06 (EP,US);
B28B11/243 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/20 (EP,US);
B33Y70/10 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/10 (US);
C04B35/117 (EP);
C04B35/48 (US);
C04B35/488 (EP);
C04B35/62844 (US);
C04B35/64 (US);
C04B35/80 (US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3817 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3852 (EP,US);
C04B2235/48 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5256 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | AUS ELASTOMEREN GEWONNENE KERAMISCHE STRUKTUREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2021/43] | English: | ELASTOMER-DERIVED CERAMIC STRUCTURES AND USES THEREOF | [2021/43] | French: | STRUCTURES EN CÉRAMIQUE DÉRIVÉES D'UN ÉLASTOMÈRE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 16.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2015089881 (STEVENSON ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-16,18,19 * par. 42, l. 5; par. 97, l. 2; p. 48, l. 2-3; par. 112, l. 2-5; p. 161, l. 2-3; p. 163; par. 171, l. 4; par. 190, l. 3-5.;; figures 1A, 1C * [Y] 17 [I] 7,8; | [Y]EP2370232 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 17 * par.79 *; | [A]KR20160085285 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-19 * par. 21, 22;; figures 1, 1A, 1B *; | [E]US2019381691 (LU JIAN [HK], et al) [E] 1-19 * par. 8, 43;; figure 1 * |