EP3823074 - DISCHARGE ENERGY RECOVERY, FORMATION AND CAPACITY GRADING DEVICE FOR SOFT-PACKAGE POWER BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Hangke Technology Incorporated Company No. 77, Gaoxin 11th Road, Qiaonan Block Xiaoshan Economic & Technological Development Zone Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Ji No. 77, Gaoxin 11th Road, Qiaonan Block Xiaoshan Economic and Technological Development Zone Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 02 /
CAO, Zheng No. 77, Gaoxin 11th Road, Qiaonan Block Xiaoshan Economic and Technological Development Zone Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 03 /
CAI, Qingyuan No. 77, Gaoxin 11th Road, Qiaonan Block Xiaoshan Economic and Technological Development Zone Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Gutenbergstraße 39 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 2 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 19836447.3 | 19.09.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019CN106557 | Priority number, date | CN201811398265 | 22.11.2018 Original published format: CN201811398265 | [2021/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020103552 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3823074 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/058, H01M10/0585, H01M10/0525, H01M10/42, H01M10/44, H01M50/211 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
H01M50/211 (EP);
H01M10/058 (CN,KR);
H01M10/446 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/441 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0585 (EP);
H01M10/4235 (KR);
H01M10/4285 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/0447 (KR);
H02J7/0029 (US);
H02J7/0042 (KR,US);
H02J7/0047 (US);
H02J7/0069 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M2220/30 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/20] | H01M10/058 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | ENTLADUNGSENERGIERÜCKGEWINNUNGS- UND -ERZEUGUNGSKAPAZITÄTSGRADIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR WEICHGEHÄUSE-STROMBATTERIE | [2021/20] | English: | DISCHARGE ENERGY RECOVERY, FORMATION AND CAPACITY GRADING DEVICE FOR SOFT-PACKAGE POWER BATTERY | [2021/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCUPÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE DE DÉCHARGE, DE FORMATION ET DE NIVELLEMENT DE CAPACITÉ POUR BATTERIE D'ALIMENTATION À CHÂSSIS SOUPLE | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2020 | Translation filed | 23.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2020 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 04.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |