EP3893899 - CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS AND CAR-T CELLS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kite Pharma, Inc. 2400 Broadway Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELK, Jonathan P.O. Box 740 Grantham, NH 03753 / US | 02 /
PEREZ, Arianne 4837 Dunman Ave. Woodland Hills, CA 91364 / US | 03 /
RODRIGUEZ, Ruben Alvarez 6658 Berquist Ave. West Hills, California 91307 / US | 04 /
SIEVERS, Stuart A. c/o Kite Pharma, Inc. 2400 Broadway Santa Monica, California 90404 / US | 05 /
WILTZIUS, Jed Winchester, MA 01890 / US | [2023/35] |
Former [2021/42] | 01 /
BELK, Jonathan P.O. Box 740 Grantham, NH 03753 / US | ||
02 /
PEREZ, Arianne 4837 Dunman Ave. Woodland Hills, CA 91364 / US | |||
03 /
RODRIGUEZ, Ruben Alvarez 6658 Berquist Ave. West Hills, California 91307 / US | |||
04 /
SIEVERS, Stuart A. c/o Kite Pharma, Inc. 2400 Broadway Santa Monica, California 90404 / US | Representative(s) | Müller, Christian Stefan Gerd ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19836733.6 | 11.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019US65776 | Priority number, date | US201862778893P | 12.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862778893 P | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020123691 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3893899 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/17, A61K39/00, A61P35/02, C07K14/725, C07K16/28 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
C07K16/2887 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (IL,US);
A61K2239/29 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4644 (KR);
A61K39/464412 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/464424 (EP,IL,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/04 (KR);
C07K14/7051 (EP,IL);
C07K16/2803 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2896 (US);
C12N15/63 (US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,IL,US);
C12N5/10 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2121/00 (KR);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/35 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/73 (US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE ANTIGEN-REZEPTOREN UND CAR-T-ZELLEN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/42] | English: | CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS AND CAR-T CELLS AND METHODS OF USE | [2021/42] | French: | RÉCEPTEURS ANTIGÉNIQUES CHIMÉRIQUES ET RÉCEPTEURS DE LYMPHOCYTES T ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 09.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP2814846 (SEATTLE CHILDREN S HOSPITAL D B A SEATTLE CHILDREN S RES INST [US]); | [A]WO2016201389 (ALECTOR LLC [US]); | [I]WO2017025038 (NANJING LEGEND BIOTECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2017189959 (VOYAGER THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | by applicant | US5013556 | US5308341 | US5443505 | US5728388 | US5773019 | US5827642 | US5830462 | US5834266 | US5869337 | US6001386 | US6040177 | US6146361 | US6165787 | US6168587 | US6192891 | US6194389 | US6200296 | US6277099 | US6302855 | WO0178693 | US6319494 | US2002006409 | US2002026176 | US6472375 | US6471996 | US2004014194 | WO2004024156 | WO2004026380 | WO2004073551 | US6797514 | US6867041 | US6905874 | US2005271660 | WO2008081035 | US2009110679 | US7556615 | US7709226 | US7741465 | US2011286980 | US2012130076 | WO2012079000 | WO2012129514 | US8486693 | US2013287748 | US2014050708 | US2014099309 | US2014154228 | US2014171649 | US2014227237 | WO2014127261 | US2014286987 | WO2015090229 | US2015266973 | US2016046700 | US2017041534 | US19430622621 | US19500621677 |