EP3704694 - IN-PIVOT STEPPER MOTOR FOR BALL SCREW CAM ELEVATOR MECHANISM FOR COLD STORAGE DATA STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Western Digital Technologies, Inc. 5601 Great Oaks Parkway San Jose, CA 95119 / US | [2024/21] |
Former [2020/37] | For all designated states Western Digital Technologies, Inc. 5601 Great Oaks Parkway San Jose, CA 95119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MYERS, David 5601 Great Oaks Parkway San Jose, CA 95119 / US | 02 /
NGUYEN, Diep 5601 Great Oaks Parkway San Jose, CA 95119 / US | 03 /
SUKLA, Bikash 5601 Great Oaks Parkway San Jose, CA 95119 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/21] |
Former [2020/37] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19837877.0 | 17.07.2019 | [2020/37] | WO2019US42182 | Priority number, date | US201862700777P | 19.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862700777 P | US201862700780P | 19.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862700780 P | US201862702163P | 23.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862702163 P | US201862702154P | 23.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862702154 P | US201862747623P | 18.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862747623 P | US201916513585 | 16.07.2019 Original published format: US201916513585 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020018654 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3704694 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3704694 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/55, G11B21/02, H02K21/14, H02K7/06, H02K7/14, G11B5/48, // H02K37/12, F16H25/22 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H02K7/14 (EP,US);
G11B5/55 (US);
F16H25/2204 (EP,US);
F16H25/2238 (US);
G11B5/4813 (EP);
G11B5/5569 (EP,US);
H02K1/145 (US);
H02K37/10 (US);
H02K37/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | G11B5/55, G11B21/02, H02K21/14, H02K7/06, H02K7/14, // H02K37/12, F16H25/22 | ||
Former IPC [2020/37] | G11B5/55, G11B21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN ZAPFEN INTEGRIERTER SCHRITTMOTOR FÜR KUGELGEWINDENOCKENHEBEMECHANISMUS FÜR SPEICHERGERÄT FÜR KALTE DATEN | [2023/49] | English: | IN-PIVOT STEPPER MOTOR FOR BALL SCREW CAM ELEVATOR MECHANISM FOR COLD STORAGE DATA STORAGE DEVICE | [2020/37] | French: | MOTEUR PAS-À-PAS INTÉGRÉ À UN PIVOT POUR MÉCANISME D'ÉLÉVATEUR À CAME À VIS À BILLES POUR DISPOSITIF DE MÉMORISATION DE DONNÉES À FROID | [2023/48] |
Former [2020/37] | ZAPFENINTERNER SCHRITTMOTOR FÜR KUGELGEWINDENOCKENHEBEMECHANISMUS FÜR DATENSPEICHERGERÄT EINES KÜHLHAUSES | ||
Former [2020/37] | MOTEUR PAS-À-PAS INTÉGRÉ À UN PIVOT POUR MÉCANISME D'ÉLÉVATEUR À CAME À VIS À BILLES POUR DISPOSITIF DE MÉMORISATION DE DONNÉES EN STOCKAGE À FROID | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 27.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 15.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 15.04.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.04.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6005747 (GILOVICH PAUL A [US]) [Y] 6 * figures 2, 3 *; | [Y]EP1538066 (RENAULT [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028]; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE102007046382 (GETRAG GETRIEBE ZAHNRAD [DE]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0028] ** paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0083] *; | [Y]US2010091408 (ALBRECHT THOMAS R [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1A * * paragraph [0032] *; | [Y]US2013213163 (NAKAMURA MANABU [JP], et al) [Y] 2,4,5,12,13 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2A, 2B * * paragraph [0039] * | International search | [Y]JP2005346891 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 10, 11 * See paragraphs [19],[22] and figure 2 *; | [XYA]US2010091408 (ALBRECHT THOMAS R [US], et al) [X] 21, 22 * See paragraphs [16],[17],[32],[36] and figures 1A,1B,5 * [Y] 1-7, 10-12, 16, 18-20 [A] 8, 9, 13-15; | [Y]US2011080675 (BOUTAGHOU ZINE-EDDINE [US], et al) [Y] 1-7, 10-12, 16, 18-20 * See paragraph [60] and figure 4 *; | [XY]US2015070798 (SHIRAISHI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 17 * See paragraphs [32],[33],[49] and figures 1,3 * [Y] 3-6, 18; | [Y]US2017108052 (LITTLEFIELD JOSEPH RALPH [US], et al) [Y] 12, 19, 20* See paragraph [38] and figure 4 * | Examination | US5880569 | by applicant | EP1538066 | US2010091408 | US2013213163 |