EP3825077 - CONTROL DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD, AND CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2021/21] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku 108-0075 Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUDA, Yasuhiro c/o Sony Corporation, 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
NAGASAKA, Kenichiro c/o Sony Corporation, 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
MASUDA, Hiromasa c/o Sony Corporation, 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
HONGO, Kazuo c/o Sony Corporation, 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19838444.8 | 08.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019JP26927 | Priority number, date | JP20180134482 | 17.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018134482 | [2021/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020017370 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3825077 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25J13/08, B25J19/06, B25J9/16 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
B25J9/1628 (EP);
B25J9/1633 (EP,US);
B25J13/085 (US);
B25J9/1607 (US);
B25J9/1674 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39392 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/21] | B25J13/08, B25J19/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND STEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/21] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD, AND CONTROL SYSTEM | [2021/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2021 | Translation filed | 07.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 16.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5056038 (KUNO TOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * column 2 - column 7 * [Y] 2-13; | [X]US2010234999 (NAKAJIMA YUICHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,14,15 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0091] *; | [Y]WO2017044965 (UNIV DUKE [US]) [Y] 2-13* paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0141] * | International search | [A]JPH1177580 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-16 * , entire text, all drawings & JP 2007-144621 A *; | [A]JP2010105138 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-16 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2011/0060460 A1, entire text, all drawings & WO 2010/050119 A1 *; | [A]JP2016190292 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-16* , entire text, all drawings & US 2016/0288327 A1, entire text, all drawings & CN 106003019 A * | by applicant | WO2015046081 | JP2017124455 |