EP3825675 - VEHICLE TESTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horiba, Ltd. 2, Miyanohigashi-cho Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | [2021/46] |
Former [2021/21] | For all designated states HORIBA, Ltd. 2, Miyanohigashi-cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAYAMA, Takashi c/o Horiba, Ltd. 2, Miyanohigashi-cho Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | 02 /
ADACHI, Kaori c/o Horiba, Ltd. 2, Miyanohigashi-cho Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | 03 /
ZHANG, Dongkai c/o Horiba, Ltd. 2, Miyanohigashi-cho Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | [2021/46] |
Former [2021/21] | 01 /
NAGAYAMA, Takashi c/o HORIBA, Ltd., 2, Miyanohigashi-cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | ||
02 /
ADACHI, Kaori c/o HORIBA, Ltd., 2, Miyanohigashi-cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Dongkai c/o HORIBA, Ltd., 2, Miyanohigashi-cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19838685.6 | 16.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019JP27860 | Priority number, date | JP20180135371 | 18.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018135371 | [2021/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020017485 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3825675 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3825675 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/007, B60C19/00 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
G01M17/0074 (EP);
G01M17/0072 (US);
G01L5/282 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGPRÜFVORRICHTUNG | [2021/21] | English: | VEHICLE TESTING DEVICE | [2021/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TEST DE VÉHICULE | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2020 | Translation filed | 26.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2024 | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1338881 (EUROP ECONOMIC COMMUNITY [BE]) [Y] 4-6* figure 1 *; | [XY]WO2015178362 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-13 * abstract * * figures 1, 4 * [Y] 4-6; | [XYI] - Austin Blankenbeckler, "New GM Brake Testing Facility Creates the Sounds of Silence", Austin Blankenbeckler, (20140101), URL: https://thenewswheel.com/new-gm-brake-testing-facility-creates-sounds-silence/, (20220227), XP055678408 [X] 1-3,7,12,13 * abstract * * fig. on pages 1, 2 * [Y] 4-6 [I] 8-11 | International search | [Y]JPH0643940B (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [Y] 10-11 * , *; | [A]JP3109396B [A] 1-13; | [X]JP2009133631 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-3, 6-9, 12-13 * , *; | [A]WO2010143644 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * , *; | [Y]WO2015178362 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 8-11 * . *; | [A]US2016061692 (HOREJSI JOSEF [CZ], et al) [A] 1-13* , [0022]-[0031],FIG.1 & DE 202015104255 U1 & CZ 27656 U1 & ES 1143058 U *; | [XY] - "New GM Brake Testing Facility Creates the Sounds of Silence", (20140703), URL: https://thenewswheel.com/new-gm-brake-testing-facility-creates-sounds-silence, (20191001), XP055678408 [X] 1-3, 6-7, 12-13 [Y] 8-11 | by applicant | JP2001289741 | JP2016001173 |