EP3795735 - CLEANING DEVICE, WASHING MACHINE, AND DETERGENT DELIVERY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YI, Zhenxu West Jinji Road, Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Hongyong West Jinji Road, Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 03 /
LV, Zhongpeng West Jinji Road, Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 04 /
LIN, Zihao West Jinji Road, Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Guojie West Jinji Road, Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Jian West Jinji Road, Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 07 /
JIANG, Bisheng West Jinji Road, Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2021/12] | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 19838805.0 | 30.01.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019CN73967 | Priority number, date | CN201810804441 | 20.07.2018 Original published format: CN201810804441 | [2021/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020015351 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3795735 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08, D06F39/02, D06F33/30, // D06F103/14 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
D06F39/028 (EP);
D06F33/00 (CN);
D06F34/18 (CN);
D06F34/22 (CN);
D06F39/022 (CN);
D06F39/088 (EP,CN);
D06F2103/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | D06F39/08, D06F39/02, D06F33/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, WASCHMASCHINE UND WASCHMITTELABGABEVERFAHREN | [2021/12] | English: | CLEANING DEVICE, WASHING MACHINE, AND DETERGENT DELIVERY METHOD | [2021/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE, MACHINE À LAVER, ET PROCÉDÉ D'AMENÉE DE DÉTERGENT | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2020 | Translation filed | 15.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 08.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE10150877 (T & P SPA [IT]); | [XA]WO03014453 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [XA]EP3075897 (HAIER GROUP CORP [CN], et al) | International search | [A]JPH06327880 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-15* entire document *; | [Y]CN101555656 (WENTAO REN [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * description, page 4, lines 10-14, and figures 1-7 *; | [Y]CN102517850 (HAIER GROUP CO LTD, et al) [Y] 5, 6, 14, 15 * description, paragraphs [0062]-[0082], and figures 1-3 *; | [A]CN205398988U (PANASONIC HOME APPLIANCES R&D CENTER (HANGZHOU) CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [Y]CN107237088 (PANASONIC HOME APPLIANCES R&D CT HANGZHOU CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0032]-[0061], and figures 1-4 *; | [Y]CN107869026 (DONGBU DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP) [Y] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0087] and [0088], and figures 1-4 *; | [PX]CN108677457 (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES INC ZHUHAI) [PX] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0036]-[0057], and figures 1-5 * |