EP3902602 - MULTILEAF COLLIMATOR WITH ALTERNATING TRAPEZOIDAL LEAF GEOMETRY DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Varian Medical Systems, Inc. 3100 Hansen Way M/S E-339 Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | For all designated states Siemens Healthineers International AG Hinterbergstrasse 14 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [2023/19] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states Varian Medical Systems, Inc. 3100 Hansen Way M/S E-339 Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
For all designated states Varian Medical Systems International AG Hinterbergstrasse 14 6312 Steinhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEGER, Rachel Escondido / US | 02 /
KAUPPINEN, Juha Espoo / FI | 03 /
MAGLIARI, Anthony Newark, IL / US | 04 /
BAIC, Dusan Santa Clara / US | [2021/44] | Representative(s) | Foster, Mark Charles Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [2023/28] |
Former [2021/44] | Foster, Mark Charles Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 19839469.4 | 16.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019US66430 | Priority number, date | US201816236112 | 28.12.2018 Original published format: US201816236112 | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020139590 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3902602 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3902602 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
A61N5/1045 (EP,US);
A61B6/06 (US);
A61N5/1081 (US);
G21K1/02 (US);
G21K1/025 (US);
G21K1/04 (US);
G21K1/043 (US);
A61N2005/1095 (US);
G21K1/046 (US);
G21K5/04 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Extension states | BA | 20.05.2021 | ME | 20.05.2021 | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRBLATTKOLLIMATOR MIT ALTERNIERENDER TRAPEZFÖRMIGER BLATTGEOMETRIE | [2021/44] | English: | MULTILEAF COLLIMATOR WITH ALTERNATING TRAPEZOIDAL LEAF GEOMETRY DESIGN | [2021/44] | French: | COLLIMATEUR MULTILAME DE CONCEPTION GÉOMÉTRIQUE DE LAME ALTERNÉE TRAPÉZOÏDALE | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 20.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | LU | 16.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SI | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012043481 (MANSFIELD STANLEY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0032] *; | [AD]US8637841 (PRINCE STEVEN W [US], et al) [AD] 1-20 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 12 * * column 5, line 66 - column 7, line 16 * * figures 2, 4 *; | [A]US2016361566 (LARKIN DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0059] ** figures 6A, 6B * | by applicant | US7742575 | US8637841 |