EP3830182 - HIGH-MOLECULAR-WEIGHT FUCANS FOR TREATING FIBROUS ADHESIONS AND OTHER DISEASES AND CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arc Medical Devices, Inc. Unit 8, 3071 No. 5 Road Richmond, British Columbia V6X 2T4 / CA | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRINGATE, Christopher Michael Kevin Unit 8, 3071 No. 5 Road Richmond, British Columbia V6X 2T4 / CA | 02 /
MILLET, Ian Unit 8, 3071 No. 5 Road Richmond, British Columbia V6X 2T4 / CA | 03 /
DASWANI, Sailesh Haresh Unit 8, 3071 No. 5 Road Richmond, British Columbia V6X 2T4 / CA | 04 /
SUN, Hesong Unit 8, 3071 No. 5 Road Richmond, British Columbia V6X 2T4 / CA | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19839914.9 | 24.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019CA51027 | Priority number, date | US201862711335P | 27.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862711335 P | US201862711364P | 27.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862711364 P | US201862711372P | 27.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862711372 P | US201862713392P | 01.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862713392 P | US201862713399P | 01.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862713399 P | US201862713413P | 01.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862713413 P | US201862722135P | 23.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862722135 P | US201862722137P | 23.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862722137 P | US201862755311P | 02.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862755311 P | US201862755318P | 02.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862755318 P | US201862755328P | 02.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862755328 P | US201962793514P | 17.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962793514 P | US201962793654P | 17.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962793654 P | US201962861223P | 13.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962861223 P | US201962861228P | 13.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962861228 P | US201962861235P | 13.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962861235 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020019078 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830182 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00, A61K31/737, A61P41/00, C08L5/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
A61P41/00 (EP,IL,US);
C08B37/0003 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/737 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K41/00 (KR);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K9/0034 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | C08L5/00, A61K31/737, A61P41/00, C08B37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | HOCHMOLEKULARE FUCANE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FASERIGEN ADHÄSIONEN UND ANDEREN KRANKHEITEN UND ZUSTÄNDEN | [2021/23] | English: | HIGH-MOLECULAR-WEIGHT FUCANS FOR TREATING FIBROUS ADHESIONS AND OTHER DISEASES AND CONDITIONS | [2021/23] | French: | FUCANES DE POIDS MOLÉCULAIRE ÉLEVÉ POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'ADHÉSIONS FIBREUSES ET D'AUTRES MALADIES ET AFFECTIONS | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 14.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 31.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 31.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009170801 (HAO SHOUZHU [CN]) [X] 1-7,9-16,19,20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 21] , [0 22] , [0 23] * * Table;; examples 1-2 * * paragraph [0051] * [I] 21; | [A]US2011021457 (SPRINGATE CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL KEVIN [CA]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035] ** examples 1-6 *; | [XI] - FITTON JANET ET AL, "Therapies from Fucoidan: An Update", MARINE DRUGS, Basel, CH, (20160906), vol. 13, no. 9, doi:10.3390/md13095920, ISSN 1660-3397, pages 5920 - 5946, XP055848218 [X] 1-19 * abstract * * page 5924; table 1 * [I] 20,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/md13095920 | International search | [X]US8426381 (THIBODEAU ALAIN [CA], et al) [X] 104-111, 115-120; | [X]CN105399848 (SHANGHAI INST MATERIA MEDICA CAS) [X] 1-84, 121-138 * google translation. *; | [X]CN106832022 (WEIHAI YUWANG GROUP CO LTD) [X] 85-94, 111-114 * abstract google patents *; | [X]US2018051097 (SPRINGATE CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL KEVIN [CA]) [X] 1-84; | [X] - Chizhov A O; Dell A; Morris H R; Haslam S M; McDowell R A; Shashkov A S; Nifant'ev N E; Khatuntseva E A; Usov A I, "A study of fucoidan from the brown seaweed Chorda filum", Carbohydrate Research, (19990720), vol. 320, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0008-6215(99)00148-2, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 108 - 119, XP004184168 [X] 1-84, 121-138 * . (whole document) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(99)00148-2 | [X] - Mingyi Wu; Li Xu; Longyan Zhao; Chuang Xiao; Na Gao; Lan Luo; Lian Yang; Zi Li; Lingyun Chen; Jinhua Zhao, "Structural Analysis and Anticoagulant Activities of the Novel Sulfated Fucan Possessing a Regular Well-Defined Repeating Unit from Sea Cucumber", Marine Drugs, (20150413), vol. 13, no. 4, doi:10.3390/md13042063, ISSN 1660-3397, pages 2063 - 2084, XP055681847 [X] 139-146 * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/md13042063 | [X] - Pereira M S; Melo F R; Mourao P A S, "Is there a correlation between structure and anticoagulant action of sulfated galactans and sulfated fucans", Glycobiology, (20021001), vol. 12, no. 10, doi:10.1093/glycob/cwf077, ISSN 0959-6658, pages 573 - 580, XP055244172 [X] 139-146 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/cwf077 |