EP3828430 - ROLLING BEARING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK LTD. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-Chome Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUNJI, Daisuke c/o NSK Ltd., 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | 02 /
KUMAGAI, Hiroyasu c/o NSK Ltd., 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | 03 /
HITOMI, Naohiro c/o NSK Ltd., 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | 04 /
RODRIGUEZ, Ricardo Lopez c/o NSK Ltd., 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19840013.7 | 22.07.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019JP28655 | Priority number, date | JP20180140216 | 26.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018140216 | [2021/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020022267 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3828430 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3828430 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16C41/00, B60B35/18, F16C19/18, F16C33/76, H02J50/05, B60B27/00 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
B60B35/121 (EP);
F16C41/00 (US);
B60B27/0047 (US);
B60B27/0068 (EP);
B60B27/0073 (US);
F16C41/004 (US);
H02J50/05 (EP);
B60B2900/321 (EP);
B60B2900/931 (EP);
F16C19/186 (EP);
F16C2326/02 (EP,US);
F16C33/723 (EP,US);
F16C33/7853 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/22] | F16C41/00, B60B35/18, F16C19/18, F16C33/76, H02J50/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUGELLAGEREINHEIT | [2021/22] | English: | ROLLING BEARING UNIT | [2021/22] | French: | UNITÉ DE PALIER À ROULEMENT | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2021 | Translation filed | 25.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 18.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008014766 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [I] 4; | [XI]WO2017051881 (NSK LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3 * figure 5 * [I] 2,4; | [XI]WO2017094420 (NSK LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3 * figure - * [I] 2,4; | [XDAI]JP2018001769 (NSK LTD) [XD] 1 * paragraph [0027]; figure - * [A] 2,3 [I] 4; | [P]US2018297399 (MATSUDA YASUYUKI [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2003278779 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [Y] 4 * , *; | [A]WO2008014766 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-4* , *; | [Y]JP2014023298 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [Y] 1, 3-4 * , *; | [YA]WO2017094420 (NSK LTD [JP]) [Y] 1, 3-4 * , * [A] 2; | [A]JP2018001769 (NSK LTD) [A] 1-4 * , * | by applicant | JP2018001769 |