EP3789233 - CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN CORPORATION 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/10] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Ryo c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Yasuyuki c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 03 /
KIMATA, Kenta c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 04 /
IWASE, Takuro c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 05 /
OTSUBO, Junichiro c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2021/10] | Application number, filing date | 19840639.9 | 19.07.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019JP28523 | Priority number, date | JP20180139550 | 25.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018139550 | JP20180139551 | 25.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018139551 | [2021/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020022224 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3789233 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3789233 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60L15/20, F16H59/14, F16H59/40, F16H59/46, F16H59/70, F16H61/04, F16H61/68, F16H63/50, F16H61/02, F16H61/16 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
F16H61/0204 (EP);
B60W30/19 (US);
B60L15/20 (EP);
B60L15/2054 (US);
B60W10/08 (US);
B60W10/10 (US);
B60W30/20 (US);
F16H59/14 (EP,US);
F16H59/40 (EP);
F16H59/46 (EP);
F16H59/70 (EP,US);
F16H61/0213 (EP);
F16H61/04 (EP,US);
F16H61/16 (EP,US);
F16H61/68 (EP);
F16H63/50 (EP);
F16H63/502 (US);
B60L2240/48 (US);
B60W2510/081 (US);
B60W2510/083 (US);
B60W2520/28 (US);
B60W2520/30 (US);
B60W2530/00 (US);
B60W2710/083 (US);
B60W2710/1005 (US);
B60W2720/30 (US);
F16H2059/148 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/10] | B60L15/20, F16H59/14, F16H59/40, F16H59/46, F16H59/70, F16H61/04, F16H61/68, F16H63/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/10] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE | [2021/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2020 | Translation filed | 02.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | ES | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | IT | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | IE | 19.07.2023 | LU | 19.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
LU | 19.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
LU | 19.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5407401 (BULLMER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 3, lines 6-31 * * column 4, line 8 - column 6, line 8 *; | [A]US5685799 (VUKOVICH WILLIAM JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [A]DE19703863 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 5, line 40 - page 6, line 2 * * page 9, lines 44-68 *; | [A]EP1078804 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0023] , [0028] * | International search | [Y]US6164400 (JANKOVIC MIROSLAVA [US], et al) [Y] 1-2, 5* , column 8, lines 53-56 & GB 2338939 A *; | [YA]WO2016104800 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [Y] 1-2, 5 * , paragraphs [0009]-[0066], fig. 1-5 & US 2017/0327122 A1, paragraphs [0017]-[0086] * [A] 3-4, 6-11 | by applicant | JP2014047817 |