EP3893928 - PRODUCTION OF VIRAL VACCINES ON AN AVIAN CELL LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université Claude Bernard Lyon 1 43 Boulevard du 11 Novembre 1918 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE - INSERM 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Laval 2325 rue de l'Université Québec, Québec G1V 0A6 / CA | For all designated states TRANSGENE Parc d'Innovation Boulevard Gonthier d'Andernach 67400 Illkirch Graffenstaden / FR | For all designated states Ecole Normale Supérieure de Lyon 15 parvis René Descartes 69007 Lyon / FR | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSA-CALATRAVA, Manuel 9 bis rue du docteur Rebatel 69003 Lyon / FR | 02 /
BOIVIN, Guy 2531 Montbray Quebec, Quebec G1V1E7 / CA | 03 /
DUBOIS, Julia 75 route du mas rillier 69140 Rillieux-La-Pape / FR | 04 /
PIZZORNO, Mario Andres 14 rue Domer 69007 Lyon / FR | 05 /
TERRIER, Olivier 67 rue Bataille 69008 Lyon / FR | 06 /
TRAVERSIER, Aurélien 104 Avenue Francis de Pressensé 69200 Venissieux / FR | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19842600.9 | 12.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019FR53036 | Priority number, date | FR20180072957 | 14.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1872957 | [2021/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020120910 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3893928 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, A61P31/14, C12N7/04 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (US);
A61P31/14 (EP);
C12N7/00 (US);
C12N7/04 (EP);
A61K2039/5254 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON VIRALEN IMPFSTOFFEN AUF EINER VOGELZELLINIE | [2021/42] | English: | PRODUCTION OF VIRAL VACCINES ON AN AVIAN CELL LINE | [2021/42] | French: | PRODUCTION DE VACCINS VIRAUX SUR UNE LIGNEE CELLULAIRE AVIAIRE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 07.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/48] | Request for further processing for: | 04.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US2004241188 (COLLINS PETER L [US], et al) [X] 6-11 * page 27, paragraph [0201] - paragraph [0208]; claims 9,11,13,47,48 * * page 21, paragraph [0175] - page 24, paragraph [0188] * [A] 4,12 [Y] 1-3,5; | [A]WO2009062532 (VIRONOVATIVE BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 115, paragraph [00381]; table 8 *; | [AD]WO2012001075 (TRANSGENE [FR], et al) [AD] 1-12 * example -; claims 3,6,7 *; | [YD] - PETIOT EMMA ET AL, "Influenza viruses production: Evaluation of a novel avian cell line DuckCelt -T17", VACCINE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20170529), vol. 36, no. 22, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2017.03.102, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 3101 - 3111, XP085393890 [YD] 1-3,5 * abstract * * page 3103, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2017.03.102 | [A] - DUBOIS JULIA ET AL, "Mutations in the fusion protein heptad repeat domains of human metapneumovirus impact on the formation of syncytia", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (201706), vol. 98, no. 6, pages 1174 - 1180, XP002795008 [A] 4,12 * page 1174, column r, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/jgv.0.000796 | [A] - LE NOUEN CYRIL ET AL, "Human Metapneumovirus SH and G Glycoproteins Inhibit Macropinocytosis-Mediated Entry into Human Dendritic Cells and Reduce CD4(+) T Cell Activation", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (201406), vol. 88, no. 11, pages 6453 - 6469, XP002795009 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 6463, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 6467, column r, paragraph 2 * | by applicant | WO2005014626 | WO2007077256 | WO2009004016 | WO2012001075 | US8841433 | - JORDAN IVOS ABEILFUSS SNEUBERT ABREUL SSANDIG V, "An avian cell line designed for production of highly attenuated viruses", Vaccine, (20090129), vol. 27, no. 5, pages 748 - 56 | - PETIOT EPROUST ATRAVERSIER ADUROUS LDAPPOZZE FGRAS MGUILLARD CBALLOUL JMROSA-CALATRAVA M, "Influenza viruses production: Evaluation of a novel avian cell line DuckCelt@-T17", Vaccine, (20180524), vol. 36, no. 22, doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2017.03.102, pages 3101 - 3111, XP085393890 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2017.03.102 | - HUCK BSCHARF GNEUMANN-HAEFELIN DPUPPE WWEIGL JFALCONE V, "Novel human metapneumovirus sublineage", Emerg Infect Dis., vol. 12, no. 1, pages 147 - 50 | - NIDAIRA MTAIRA KHAMABATA HKAWAKI TGUSHI KMAHOE YMAESHIRO NAZAMA YOKANO SKYAN H, "Molecular epidemiology of human metapneumovirus from 2009 to 2011 in Okinawa, Japan", Jpn J Infect Dis., (20120700), vol. 65, no. 4, pages 337 - 40 | - HERFST SDE GRAAF MSCHRAUWEN EJSPRONG LHUSSAIN KVAN DEN HOOGEN BGOSTERHAUS ADFOUCHIER RA, "Génération of temperature-sensitive human metapneumovirus strains that provide protective immunity in hamsters", J Gen Virol., (20080700), vol. 89, pages 1553 - 62 | - WEI YZHANG YCAI HMIRZA AMLORIO RMPEEPLES MENIEWIESK SLI J, "Roles of the putative integrin-binding motif of the human metapneumovirus fusion (f) protein in cell-cell fusion, viral infectivity, and pathogenesis", J Virol., (20140400), vol. 88, no. 8, pages 4338 - 52 | - YU CMLI RPCHEN XLIU PZHAO XD, "Replication and pathogenicity of attenuated human metapneumovirus F mutants in severe combined immunodeficiency mice", Vaccine, (20120105), vol. 30, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2011.11.008, pages 231 - 6, XP028348269 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2011.11.008 | - LIU PSHU ZQIN XDOU YZHAO YZHAO X, "A live attenuated human metapneumovirus vaccine strain provides complété protection against homologous viral infection and cross-protection against heterologous viral infection in BALBIe mice", Clin Vaccine Immunol., (20130800), vol. 20, no. 8, doi:10.1128/CVI.00145-13, pages 1246 - 54, XP055290048 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CVI.00145-13 | - ZHANG YWEI YZHANG XCAI HNIEWIESK SLI J, "Rational design of human metapneumovirus live attenuated vaccine candidates by inhibiting viral mRNA cap methyltransferase", J Virol., (20141000), vol. 88, no. 19, pages 11411 - 29 | - BIACCHESI SSKIADOPOULOS MHTRAN KCMURPHY BRCOLLINS PLBUCHHOLZ UJ, "Recovery of human metapneumovirus from cDNA: optimization of growth in vitro and expression of additional genes", Virology, (20040000), vol. 321, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.virol.2003.12.020, pages 247 - 59, XP004499206 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2003.12.020 | - BIACCHESI SPHAM QNSKIADOPOULOS MHMURPHY BRCOLLINS PLBUCHHOLZ UJ, "Infection of nonhuman primates with recombinant human metapneumovirus lacking the SH, G, or M2-2 protein categorizes each as a nonessential accessory protein and identifies vaccine candidates", Journal of virology, (20050000), vol. 79, no. 19, doi:10.1128/JVI.79.19.12608-12613.2005, pages 12608 - 13, XP002790247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.79.19.12608-12613.2005 | - BUCHHOLZ UJBIACCHESI SPHAM QNTRAN KCYANG LLUONGO CLSKIADOPOULOS MHMURPHY BRCOLLINS PL, "Deletion of M2 gene open reading frames 1 and 2 of human metapneumovirus: effects on RNA synthesis, attenuation, and immunogenicity", J Virol., (20050600), vol. 79, no. 11, pages 6588 - 97 | - SCHICKLI JHKAUR JMACPHAIL MGUZZETTA JMSPAETE RRTANG RS, "Deletion of human metapneumovirus M2-2 increases mutation frequency and attenuates growth in hamsters", Virol J., (20080603), vol. 5, page 69, XP021038374 | - PHAM QNBIACCHESI SSKIADOPOULOS MHMURPHY BRCOLLINS PLBUCHHOLZ UJ, "Chimeric recombinant human metapneumoviruses with the nucleoprotein or phosphoprotein open reading frame replaced by that of avian metapneumovirus exhibit improved growth in vitro and atténuation in vivo", J Virol., (20051200), vol. 79, no. 24, doi:10.1128/JVI.79.24.15114-15122.2005, pages 15114 - 22, XP055273516 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.79.24.15114-15122.2005 | - KARRON RASAN MATEO JWANIONEK KCOLLINS PLBUCHHOLZ UJ, "Evaluation of a Live Attenuated Human Metapneumovirus Vaccine in Adults and Children", J Pediatric. Infect Dis Soc., (20180219), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 86 - 89 | - TANG RSSCHICKLI JHMACPHAIL MFERNANDES FBICHA LSPAETE JFOUCHIER RAOSTERHAUS ADSPAETE RHALLER AA, "Effects of human metapneumovirus and respiratory syncytial virus antigen insertion in two 3' proximal genome positions of bovinelhuman parainfluenza virus type 3 on virus replication and immunogenicity", J Virol., (20031000), vol. 77, no. 20, doi:10.1128/JVI.77.20.10819-10828.2003, pages 10819 - 28, XP002318487 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.77.20.10819-10828.2003 | - TANG RSMAHMOOD KMACPHAIL MGUZZETTA JMHALLER AALIU HKAUR JLAWLOR HASTILLMAN EASCHICKLI JH, "A host-range restricted parainfluenza virus type 3 (PIV3) expressing the human metapneumovirus(hMPV) fusion protein elicits protective immunity in African green monkeys", Vaccine, (20050225), vol. 23, no. 14, doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2004.10.009, pages 1657 - 67, XP004739797 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2004.10.009 | - RUSSELL CJJONES BGSEALY RESURMAN SLMASON JNHAYDEN RTTRIPP RATAKIMOTO THURWITZ JL, "A Sendai virus recombinant vaccine expressing a gene for truncated human metapneumovirus (hMPV) fusion protein protects cotton rats from hMPV challenge", Virology, (20170900), vol. 509, doi:10.1016/j.virol.2017.05.021, pages 60 - 66, XP085130836 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2017.05.021 | - BUKREYEV AWHITEHEAD SSMURPHY BRCOLLINS PL, "Recombinant respiratory syncytial virus from which the entire SH gene has been deleted grows efficiently in cell culture and exhibits site-specific atténuation in the respiratory tract of the mouse", J Virol., (19971200), vol. 71, no. 12, pages 8973 - 82, XP002198543 | - TENG MNWHITEHEAD SSCOLLINS PL, "Contribution of the respiratory syncytial virus G glycoprotein and its secreted and membrane-bound forms to virus replication in vitro and in vivo", Virology, (20011025), vol. 289, no. 2, doi:10.1006/viro.2001.1138, pages 283 - 96, XP002301784 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.2001.1138 | - DUBOIS JCAVANAGH MHTERRIER OHAMELIN MELINA BSHI R et al., "Mutations in the fusion protein heptad repeat domains of human metapneumovirus impact on the formation of syncytia", The Journal of general virology, (20170000), vol. 98, no. 6, doi:10.1099/jgv.0.000796, pages 1174 - 80, XP002795008 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/jgv.0.000796 | - KRARUP ATRUAN DFURMANOVA-HOLLENSTEIN PBOGAERT LBOUCHIER PBISSCHOP IJWIDJOJOATMODJO MNZAHN RSCHUITEMAKER HMCLELLAN JS, "A highly stable prefusion RSV F vaccine derived from structural analysis of the fusion mechanism", Nat Commun., (20150903), vol. 6, doi:10.1038/ncomms9143, page 8143, XP002755858 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms9143 | - AERTS LRHÉAUME CCARBONNEAU JLAVIGNE SCOUTURE CHAMELIN MÈBOIVIN G., "Adjuvant effect of the human metapneumovirus (HMPV) matrix protein in HMPV subunit vaccines", J Gen Virol., (20150400), vol. 96, pages 767 - 74 | - AERTS LCAVANAGH MHDUBOIS JCARBONNEAU JRHEAUME CLAVIGNE S et al., "Effect of in vitro syncytium formation on the severity of human metapneumovirus disease in a murine model", PloS one, (20150000), vol. 10, no. 3, page e0120283 | FR20180056801 | WO2019FR51759 |