EP3874524 - PASSIVE ELECTRICAL COMPONENT FOR SAFETY SYSTEM SHUTDOWN USING GAUSS' LAW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE-Hitachi Nuclear Energy Americas LLC 3901 Castle Hayne Road Wilmington, NC 28401 / US | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOEWEN, Eric P. 3901 Castle Hayne Road Wilmington, NC 28401 / US | 02 /
WEBBER, David W. 3901 Castle Hayne Road Wilmington, NC 28401 / US | 03 /
STREGE, Seth Ryan Paul 3901 Castle Hayne Road Wilmington, NC 28401 / US | 04 /
PFEFFER, Maria E. 3901 Castle Hayne Road Wilmington, NC 28401 / US | 05 /
PFEFFER, Scott L. 3901 Castle Hayne Road Wilmington, NC 28401 / US | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19842763.5 | 29.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019US58496 | Priority number, date | US201816176407 | 31.10.2018 Original published format: US201816176407 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020092324 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3874524 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G21C9/00, G21D3/06, H01H59/00 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
G21C9/00 (EP,US);
G21C9/024 (US);
G01R31/50 (US);
G21C9/027 (US);
G21D3/06 (EP,US);
H01H59/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | PASSIVE ELEKTRISCHE KOMPONENTE ZUR ABSCHALTUNG EINES SICHERHEITSSYSTEMS UNTER VERWENDUNG DES GAUSSSCHEN GESETZES | [2021/36] | English: | PASSIVE ELECTRICAL COMPONENT FOR SAFETY SYSTEM SHUTDOWN USING GAUSS' LAW | [2021/36] | French: | COMPOSANT ÉLECTRIQUE PASSIF POUR L'ARRÊT D'UN SYSTÈME DE SÉCURITÉ UTILISANT UNE LOI DE GAUSS | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 31.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/21] | 17.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2927255 (DIESEL JOHN W) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figure - * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 25 * [A] 7-10 [I] 3-6; | [XI]DE4205029 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *[I] 3-6; | [XI]US5620933 (JAMES CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3-6; | [XI]US6034339 (PINHOLT PETER [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 13 * [I] 3,5,6 |