EP3832586 - SERVER DEVICE, SHARED BATTERY UTILIZATION SERVICE SYSTEM, METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA Masayuki c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
ENDO Hirotaka c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19844086.9 | 31.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019JP30009 | Priority number, date | JP20180143638 | 31.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018143638 | [2021/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020027196 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3832586 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/10, G06Q50/26, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/00 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
G06Q50/40 (EP);
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
B60L53/64 (EP);
B60L53/65 (EP);
B60L53/665 (EP);
B60L53/68 (EP);
G01R21/133 (US);
G06Q30/0226 (EP);
G06Q30/0645 (EP,US);
G07C5/02 (US);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/44 (EP);
H01M10/46 (EP);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H02J7/00036 (EP);
B60L2240/70 (EP);
H01M2010/4278 (EP);
H02J2310/48 (EP);
H02J7/0013 (EP);
H02J7/0045 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP);
Y02T90/167 (EP);
Y04S30/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | SERVERVORRICHTUNG, GEMEINSAMES BATTERIENUTZUNGSDIENSTSYSTEM, VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2021/23] | English: | SERVER DEVICE, SHARED BATTERY UTILIZATION SERVICE SYSTEM, METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2021/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF SERVEUR, SYSTÈME DE SERVICE D'UTILISATION DE BATTERIE PARTAGÉE, PROCÉDÉ, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2021 | Translation filed | 24.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0877342 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-15* abstract *; | [I]EP2737600 (GOGORO INC [KY]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0011] - [0013] - [0017] , [0019] - [0022] - [0028] , [0031] - [0033] - [0036] , [0042] , [0046] - [0048] - [0059] - [0061] - [0092] * * paragraphs [0093] , [0120] , [0126]; figure -; claim - *; | [I]EP3249774 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0025] - [0033] - [0036] , [0045] , [0146] , [0147] , [0153] , [0157] - [0158] - [0166] , [0175]; figure -; claim - * | International search | [A]JP2010081722 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-15 * , & US 2010/0076825 A1, *; | [A]JP2012059197 (NIPPON YUNISHISU KK) [A] 1-15 * , *; | [A]JP2014527689 [A] 1-15 * . *; | [A]WO2017222015 (FUJIYOSHI NOBUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-15* , & CN 109416792 A *; | [A]JP2018019483 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-15 * , * | by applicant | JP2018143638 | JP2019068552 |