EP3832360 - LIGHT WAVELENGTH CONVERSION MEMBER AND LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niterra Co., Ltd. 1-1-1, Higashisakura Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-0005 / JP | [2023/36] |
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAKU, Shohei c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD., 14-18, Takatsuji- cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP | 02 /
KATSU, Yusuke c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD., 14-18, Takatsuji- cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Tsuneyuki c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD., 14-18, Takatsuji- cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP | 04 /
KURAHASHI, Toshiaki c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD., 14-18, Takatsuji- cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP | 05 /
YAMADA, Hideto c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD., 14-18, Takatsuji- cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19844610.6 | 17.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019JP28161 | Priority number, date | JP20180143791 | 31.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018143791 | [2021/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020026819 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3832360 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/02, C09K11/77, G02B5/20, C04B35/117, H01L33/50, C04B35/115, C04B35/64, C04B35/626, C09K11/65 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
H01L33/502 (EP,US);
G02B5/206 (EP,KR);
C09K11/7774 (EP,US);
C04B35/10 (US);
C04B35/115 (EP);
C04B35/117 (EP,KR);
C04B35/6261 (EP);
C04B35/62695 (EP);
C04B35/64 (EP);
C09K11/02 (EP,US);
G02B1/02 (KR);
H01L33/501 (KR);
C04B2235/3222 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP);
C04B2235/3225 (EP);
C04B2235/3229 (EP);
C04B2235/5436 (EP);
C04B2235/5445 (EP);
C04B2235/6565 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/764 (EP);
C04B2235/77 (EP);
C04B2235/80 (EP);
C04B2235/9646 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | G02B5/20, C04B35/117, C09K11/80, H01L33/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | LICHTWELLENLÄNGENUMWANDLUNGSELEMENT UND LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/23] | English: | LIGHT WAVELENGTH CONVERSION MEMBER AND LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE | [2021/23] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONVERSION DE LONGUEUR D'ONDE DE LUMIÈRE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2021 | Translation filed | 25.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 10.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/10] | 17.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018079419 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]WO2018079421 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [X] 1-3* abstract *; | [X]JP2018109664 (COORSTEK KK) [X] 1-3 * examples 1,2; claims 1-4 * * paragraph [0021] *; | [E]EP3534190 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [E] 1-3 * examples 1-4; claims 1-5 *; | [E]EP3534193 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [E] 1-3 * example -; claims 1-6 * | International search | [Y]JP2013518797 [Y] 2 * , [0111], [0113] & US 2011/0210658 A1, [0116],[0118] & WO 2011/097137 A1 & EP 2531571 A1 & TW 201135985 A & CN 102782089 A & KR 10-2013-0008525 A *; | [A]JP2018514895 [A] 1-3* , [0008]- [0011], [0052], [0053] & US 2018/0026165 A1,[Claim1],[Claim10],[0007]-[0010], [0058],[0059] & WO 2016/134995 A1 & EP 3262696 A1 & TW 201638048 A & CN 107251244 A & KR 10-2017-0122780 A *; | [XY]JP2018109664 (COORSTEK KK) [X] 1, 3 * , [0001], [ * [Y] 2 | by applicant | WO2004065324 | JP2014132084 | JP2018143791 |