EP3831810 - BENZENE DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOJIMA, Shoji c/o ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., 1-1, Sakurai 3- chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI, Kenji c/o ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., 1-1, Sakurai 3- chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 03 /
KAMBE, Tohru c/o ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., 1-1, Sakurai 3- chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 04 /
KONEMURA, Takashi c/o ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., 1-1, Sakurai 3- chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 05 /
GOTO, Yoshikazu c/o ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., 1-1, Sakurai 3- chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19844712.0 | 30.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019JP29883 | Priority number, date | JP20180143024 | 31.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018143024 | [2021/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020027150 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3831810 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C311/21, A61K31/192, A61P25/00, C07C59/64, C07C311/14, C07D209/08, C07D209/44, C07D213/71, C07D215/58, C07D217/08, C07D277/24, C07D295/185, C07D305/06, C07D307/14, C07D333/62, A61K45/06 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K31/192 (IL,KR);
C07C311/21 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/18 (KR);
A61K31/196 (KR);
A61K31/425 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07C311/14 (EP,IL);
C07C59/64 (IL);
C07C59/68 (EP);
C07D209/08 (EP,IL);
C07D209/44 (EP,IL);
C07D213/71 (EP,IL);
C07D213/76 (EP);
C07D215/58 (EP,IL);
C07D217/08 (EP,IL);
C07D277/24 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D295/185 (EP,IL);
C07D305/06 (EP,IL);
C07D307/14 (EP,IL);
C07D307/82 (EP);
C07D309/04 (EP);
C07D309/08 (EP);
C07D333/34 (EP);
C07D333/62 (EP,IL);
C12N5/0622 (KR);
C07B2200/07 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | C07C311/21, A61K31/192, A61P25/00, C07C59/64, C07C311/14, C07D209/08, C07D209/44, C07D213/71, C07D215/58, C07D217/08, C07D277/24, C07D295/185, C07D305/06, C07D307/14, C07D333/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | BENZOLDERIVAT | [2021/23] | English: | BENZENE DERIVATIVE | [2021/23] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE BENZÈNE | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2021 | Translation filed | 28.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 05.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006113471 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2009062883 (ACRAF [IT], et al); | [X]CN105622488 (UNIV NANYANG NORMAL); | [X]WO2017068070 (VASSILATIS DEMETRIOS K [GR], et al) | International search | [A]WO03016254 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2006113471 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [A]JP2011503030 ; | [A]CN105622488 (UNIV NANYANG NORMAL); | [A]WO2017068070 (VASSILATIS DEMETRIOS K [GR], et al) |