EP3832440 - TEXT INPUT METHOD AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO., LTD. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Songjie 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19845388.8 | 16.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019CN96086 | Priority number, date | CN201810862769 | 01.08.2018 Original published format: CN201810862769 | [2021/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020024788 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3832440 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/023, G06F3/01, G06F3/0488, G06F3/16, G06F40/166 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
G06F3/0233 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/018 (EP);
G06F3/04883 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,KR);
G06F3/167 (EP,KR,US);
G06F40/166 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | G06F3/023 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | TEXTEINGABEVERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄT | [2021/23] | English: | TEXT INPUT METHOD AND TERMINAL | [2021/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SAISIE DE TEXTE ET TERMINAL | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2021 | Translation filed | 01.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 25.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6661920 (SKINNER CRAIG STUART [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10,13,14 * abstract * * column 8, line 41 - column 9, line 14 *[I] 2,5,6,8,11,12; | [XI]EP2778879 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,3-7,9-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0148] * [I] 2,8 | International search | [A]JP2004145732 (EIGYOTATSU KOFUN YUGENKOSHI) [A] 1-14* entire document *; | [Y]CN1866171 (INVENTEC SHANGHAI ELECTRONICS [CN]) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1-4, description, pages 4-5, and figure 1 *; | [Y]CN106020699 (BEIJING MI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD) [Y] 1-14 * abstract, claims 1-13, and figures 1-7 *; | [A]CN106354276 (BEIJING YUANXIN SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [PX]CN109032380 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-14 * claims 1-13 * |