EP3814896 - TASK COMPLETION USING A BLOCKCHAIN NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Balanced Media Technology, LLC 610 Elm Street Suite 700 McKinney, Texas 75069 / US | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Corey 610 Elm St., Suite 700 McKinney, Texas 75069 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Loo, Chi Ching, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 3BA / GB | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19845503.2 | 02.08.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019US44810 | Priority number, date | US201862713780P | 02.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862713780 P | US201916529478 | 01.08.2019 Original published format: US201916529478 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020028758 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814896 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F9/50, G06N3/08, G06N5/00, G06N20/00, H04L9/32 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
G06F9/5027 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04L63/12 (IL,US);
G06F9/5038 (EP,IL,KR);
G06F9/5072 (IL,KR,US);
G06N20/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06N3/08 (EP,IL,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | G06F9/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | AUFGABENAUSFÜHRUNG MIT EINEM BLOCKCHAIN-NETZWERK | [2021/18] | English: | TASK COMPLETION USING A BLOCKCHAIN NETWORK | [2021/18] | French: | RÉALISATION D'UNE TÂCHE À L'AIDE D'UN RÉSEAU DE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 02.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015170112 (DECASTRO ERLY DALVO [US]) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [A]US2017103472 (SHAH SHAHID N [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [X]US2017287090 (HUNN PETER GEOFFREY LERATO [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * , entire document, especially para [0031], [0043], [0044], [0061], [0101], [0103], [0166], [0175], [0179], [0191] *; | [A]US2018137512 (GEORGIADIS IOANNIS [GR], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document * | by applicant | - MING LI et al., "CrowdBC: A Block-based Decentralized Framework for Crowdsourcing", International Association for Cryptologic Research, (20180712), vol. 20180711, pages 1 - 15 |