EP3829537 - LOW DOSAGE INTRANASAL AMINOSTEROL DOSAGE FORMS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enterin, Inc. 2005 Market Street, Suite 3125 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZASLOFF, Michael 2005 Market Street Suite 3125 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103 / US | 02 /
BARBUT, Denise 2005 Market Street Suite 3125 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 19845506.5 | 02.08.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US44882 | Priority number, date | US201862714470P | 03.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862714470 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020028791 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3829537 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/519, A61P1/10, A61P25/16, A61P25/28, A61K9/00, A61K9/08 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K31/575 (EP,US);
A61K35/60 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/26 (US);
A61K9/0043 (EP,US);
A61K9/0085 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/575, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | A61K9/00, A61K31/575, A61K35/60, A61K45/06, A61P29/00, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Extension states | BA | 26.02.2021 | ME | 26.02.2021 | Title | German: | INTRANASALE DARREICHUNGSFORMEN VON AMINOSTEROL MIT NIEDRIGER DOSIERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2021/23] | English: | LOW DOSAGE INTRANASAL AMINOSTEROL DOSAGE FORMS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME | [2021/23] | French: | FORMES POSOLOGIQUES D'AMINOSTÉROL INTRANASALE À FAIBLE DOSAGE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉS | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 12.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 20.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.06.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.06.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5192756 (ZASLOFF MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * claim - *; | [X]WO2006119211 (GENAERA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * claim - *; | [X]WO2015200195 (ZASLOFF MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-3,5-7,11-26 *; | [E]WO2019241503 (ENTERIN INC [US]) [E] 1-10* claims 1,2,4 *; | [X] - MICHELE PERNI ET AL, ACS CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (20180628), vol. 13, no. 8, doi:10.1021/acschembio.8b00466, ISSN 1554-8929, pages 2308 - 2319, XP055662730 [X] 1-10 * page 2308, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acschembio.8b00466 | [X] - MICHELE PERNI ET AL, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20170117), vol. 114, no. 6, doi:10.1073/pnas.1610586114, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E1009 - E1017, XP055580296 [X] 1-10 * page E1009, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1610586114 | [X] - SHPAKOV A O, "Functional Activity of the Insulin Signaling System of the Brain in Health and Type 2 Diabetes Mellitus", NEUROSCIENCE AND BEHAVIORAL PHYSIOLOGY, CONSULTANTS BUREAU, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 47, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S11055-016-0385-8, ISSN 0097-0549, (20161217), pages 190 - 203, (20161217), XP036125244 [X] 1-10 * page 200, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11055-016-0385-8 | [X] - MARCELO N. N. VIEIRA ET AL, "Protein Tyrosine Phosphatase 1B (PTP1B): A Potential Target for Alzheimer’s Therapy?", FRONTIERS IN AGING NEUROSCIENCE, (20170131), vol. 9, doi:10.3389/fnagi.2017.00007, XP055662734 [X] 1-10 * PTP1B inhibitors and conclusion; page 5, column 1 - column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fnagi.2017.00007 | International search | [X]US6143738 (ZASLOFF MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-3 * See claims 1, 8, 10. *; | [A]US2008058300 (MCLANE MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * See abstract; and claims 1, 35. *; | [A]US2013217707 (FARAONE STEPHEN V [US]) [A] 1-3* See abstract; and claim 1. *; | [A]US2018002370 (ZASLOFF MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-3 * See abstract; and claims 1,2. *; | [A]US2018133230 (ZASLOFF MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-3 * See abstract; paragraph [0159]; and claims 1. * |