EP3898595 - PYRIMIDONE DERIVATIVES AS SELECTIVE CYTOTOXIC AGENTS AGAINST HIV INFECTED CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [2022/42] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Road Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONVERSO, Antonella 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 02 /
EL MARROUNI, Abdellatif 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 03 /
FORSTER, Ashley 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 04 /
FRIE, Jessica, L. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 05 /
HUNTER, David, N. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 06 /
KUDUK, Scott, D. 219 Summerwind Lane Harleysville, Pennsylvania 19438 / US | 07 /
MITCHELL, Helen, J. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 08 /
NANTERMET, Philippe 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 09 /
SHA, Deyou 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 10 /
SHIPE, William Daniel 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 18486 / US | 11 /
WANG, Cheng 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 12 /
WANG, Deping 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/43] | Jaap, David Robert Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | Application number, filing date | 19845846.5 | 13.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019US66125 | Priority number, date | US201862781356P | 18.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862781356 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020131597 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3898595 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3898595 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/52, A61K31/505, A61P31/18 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
C07D239/52 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D403/06 (KR,US);
A61K31/513 (KR);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P31/18 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D403/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | 19.07.2021 | ME | 19.07.2021 | Validation states | MA | 19.07.2021 | MD | 19.07.2021 | TN | 19.07.2021 | Title | German: | PYRIMIDONDERIVATE ALS SELEKTIVE CYTOTOXISCHE MITTEL GEGEN HIV-INFIZIERTE ZELLEN | [2021/43] | English: | PYRIMIDONE DERIVATIVES AS SELECTIVE CYTOTOXIC AGENTS AGAINST HIV INFECTED CELLS | [2021/43] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRIMIDONE EN TANT QU'AGENTS CYTOTOXIQUES SÉLECTIFS CONTRE DES CELLULES INFECTÉES PAR LE VIH | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2021 | Observations by third parties | 14.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 19.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.03.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2014058747 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [X] 1-4,14-19,22-31 * Compounds IX-3 in Scheme IX on page 59;; examples 136-137,141,143-145; claims 1,17,21 * [I] 1-31; | [A]WO2015153304 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [A] 1-31* claims 1,13 * | Examination | - Chelur Dattananda S. ET AL, "Targeted cell killing by reconstituted caspases", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, (20070213), vol. 104, no. 7, doi:10.1073/pnas.0610877104, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2283 - 2288, XP093046410 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0610877104 | by applicant | - J. B. DINOSO et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (20090000), vol. 106, no. 23, pages 9403 - 9408 | - TACHEDJIAN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (20010000), vol. 98, no. 13, page 7188 | - TACHEDJIAN et al., FEBS Lett., (20050000), vol. 579, page 379 | - FIGUEIREDO et al., PLOS Path., (20060000), vol. 2, no. 11, page 1051 | - SUDO et al., J. Virol., (20130000), vol. 87, no. 6, page 3348 | - JOCHMANS et al., Retrovirology, (20100000), vol. 7, page 89 | - ZERBATO et al., Antimicrob. Agents Chemother, (20170000), vol. 61, no. 3 | - TRINITE et al., Retrovirology, (20190000), vol. 16, no. 17 | - S. AITIPAMULA et al., Crystal Growth and Design, (20120000), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 2147 - 2152 | - A.T.M. SERAJUDDIN, J Pharm Sci, (19990000), vol. 88, no. 10, pages 1058 - 1066 | - F. KESISOGLOUS. PANMAIY. WU, Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (20070000), vol. 59, no. 7, pages 631 - 644 |