EP3797493 - END-TO-END (E2E) PERFORMANCE MEASUREMENTS IN 5G NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAO, Yizhi 2352 W. Desertbroom Pl Chandler, AZ 85248 / US | 02 /
CHOU, Joey 8825 N. 85th Place Scottsdale, AZ 85258 / US | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19846538.7 | 06.08.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019US45253 | Priority number, date | US201862715583P | 07.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862715583 P | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020033373 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797493 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04W24/08 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
H04L43/0852 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/08 (EP,CN,US);
H04L43/0817 (EP);
H04L43/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | ENDE-ZU-ENDE (E2E) LEISTUNGSMESSUNGEN IN 5G NETZWERKEN | [2021/13] | English: | END-TO-END (E2E) PERFORMANCE MEASUREMENTS IN 5G NETWORKS | [2021/13] | French: | MESURES DE PERFORMANCE DE BOUT EN BOUT (E2E) DANS DES RÉSEAUX 5G | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 19.04.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/21] | Divisional application(s) | EP22168354.3 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2017373950 (SZILAGYI PETER [HU], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0072] *[A] 1-7,9,10; | [XYI] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Telecommunication management; Management and orchestration of 5G networks; 5G End to end Key Performance Indicators (KPI) (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 28.554, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180803), vol. SA WG5, no. V1.2.2, pages 1 - 15, XP051475105 [X] 1,5-7 * page 5 * * Point 6.3.1 and 6.3.1.1; page 8 * * page 13 - page 14 * [Y] 8 [I] 2-4,9,10 | [XI] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Management and orchestration of 5G networks; Performance measurements and assurance data (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 28.552, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180803), vol. SA WG5, no. V0.5.2, pages 1 - 31, XP051475104 [X] 1-6 * Point 5.1.1.3; page 9 * * Points 5.1.2.3 and 5.1.2.4; page 12 - page 13 * * Point 6.1; page 26 * * page 28 - page 30 * [I] 9,10 | International search | [A]KR20170014796 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0044]; and figure 4. *; | [A]US2017373950 (SZILAGYI PETER [HU], et al) [A] 1-20* See claims 45-62. *; | [XA] - 3GPP, "3GPP; TSG SA; Management and orchestration of 5G networks; Performance measrements and assurance data (Release 15)", 3GPP TS 28.552 V0.5.2, (20180803), pages 1 - 31, XP051475104 [X] 1-9, 18-20 * See sections 5.1.2.4.1, 5.4.1.1, 5.4.2, 6.1, 6.2; and annex A.1. * [A] 10-17 | [A] - "Network Functions Virtualisation (NFV); NFV Security; Security and Trust Guidance", ETSI GS NFV-SEC 003 V1.1.1, (20141201), no. V1.1.1, XP014235736 [A] 1-20 * See sections 4.4.2.1, 5.2.2.2. * | [A] - VODAFONE, "Discussion on URLLC KPIs", 3GPP TSG-SA WG1 Meeting #82 S1-181332, Dubrovnik, Croatia, (20180515), XP051534165 [A] 1-20 * See sections 1-2. * |