EP3820221 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XUE, Yifan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CAI, Yu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LI, Xiaocui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Jian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 19847074.2 | 09.08.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019CN99933 | Priority number, date | CN201810912068 | 10.08.2018 Original published format: CN201810912068 | [2021/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020030085 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3820221 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3820221 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04W72/23, // H04W52/02, H04W72/12 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W72/23 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (KR,US);
H04W76/28 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | H04W72/04, H04L5/00, // H04W52/02, H04W72/12 | ||
Former IPC [2021/19] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2021/19] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2021/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2021 | Translation filed | 05.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 01.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017332377 (TSENG LI-CHIH [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,11,12,14,15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0162] - paragraph [0181] * * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0185] * * paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0225] ** claims 1-28 *; | [X]US2018019844 (NOGAMI TOSHIZO [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0147] * * paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0179] * * paragraph [0191] * * paragraph [0211] - paragraph [0222] * * paragraph [0229] * * paragraph [0235] * * claims 1-4 * | International search | [XA]CN102056185 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-24 * [0037]-[0095] * [A] 1-24; | [A]CN102291736 [A] 1-24 * 1õx *; | [A]CN102547996 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-24; | [A]WO2018126782 (ZTE CORP [CN])[A] 1-24 |