EP3835296 - KETOAMIDE COMPOUND AND PREPARATION METHOD, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Institute of Materia Medica, Chinese Academy of Sciences 555 Zu Chong Zhi Road Zhang Jiang Pudong, Shanghai 201203 / CN | For all designated states Fudan University No. 220 Handan Road Yangpu District Shanghai 200433 / CN | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Hong 555 Zu Chong Zhi Road, Zhang Jiang, Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Shibo No. 220, Handan Road, Yangpu District Shanghai 200433 / CN | 03 /
DAI, Wenhao 555 Zu Chong Zhi Road, Zhang Jiang, Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
LU, Lu No. 220, Handan Road, Yangpu District Shanghai 200433 / CN | 05 /
PENG, Jingjing 555 Zu Chong Zhi Road, Zhang Jiang, Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 06 /
XIA, Shuai No. 220, Handan Road, Yangpu District Shanghai 200433 / CN | 07 /
WANG, Jiang 555 Zu Chong Zhi Road, Zhang Jiang, Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 08 /
LI, Jian 555 Zu Chong Zhi Road, Zhang Jiang, Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 09 /
JIANG, Hualiang 555 Zu Chong Zhi Road, Zhang Jiang, Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 10 /
CHEN, Kaixian 555 Zu Chong Zhi Road, Zhang Jiang, Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19847084.1 | 09.08.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019CN100060 | Priority number, date | CN201810903062 | 09.08.2018 Original published format: CN201810903062 | [2021/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020030143 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3835296 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D241/44, C07D209/42, A61K31/498, A61K31/404, A61K31/454, A61K31/4025, A61K31/4525, A61K31/4709, A61P31/14 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
A61P31/14 (EP,CN,KR);
C07D403/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/343 (KR);
A61K31/4025 (KR);
A61K31/4045 (KR);
A61K31/454 (KR);
A61P31/12 (US);
C07D207/26 (EP);
C07D209/20 (US);
C07D209/42 (EP,CN,KR);
C07D211/76 (EP);
C07D241/44 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Title | German: | KETOAMIDVERBINDUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/24] | English: | KETOAMIDE COMPOUND AND PREPARATION METHOD, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION, AND USE THEREOF | [2021/24] | French: | COMPOSÉ DE CÉTOAMIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE ET UTILISATION ASSOCIÉE | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2021 | Translation filed | 09.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 21.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006061714 (PFIZER [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013049382 (UNIV KANSAS STATE [US], et al); | [XY]CN103145608 (UNIV NANKAI, et al); | [Y]WO2018042343 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE IP NO 2 LTD [GB]); |