EP3834422 - CODING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM WITH MERGE MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESENLIK, Semih c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 München / DE | 02 /
GAO, Han c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 München / DE | 03 /
CHEN, Jianle 2330 Central Expressway Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | 04 /
KOTRA, Anand Meher c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 München / DE | 05 /
WANG, Biao c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 München / DE | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19847195.5 | 12.08.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019CN100209 | Priority number, date | US201862717006P | 10.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862717006 P | US201862726424P | 03.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862726424 P | US201862726973P | 04.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862726973 P | US201862757720P | 08.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862757720 P | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020030183 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3834422 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70, H04N19/105, H04N19/176, H04N19/513, H04N19/52 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
H04N19/52 (EP,US);
H04N19/105 (EP);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/513 (EP);
H04N19/56 (US);
H04N19/96 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/24] | H04N19/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR KODIERUNG MIT VERBINDUNGSMODUS | [2021/24] | English: | CODING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM WITH MERGE MODE | [2021/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE CODIFICATION AVEC MODE DE FUSION | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 04.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY] - JEON (LGE) Y ET AL, "AHG10: Unified design on parallel merge/skip", no. JCTVC-H0090, (20120201), 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 20120201 - 20120210; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jct/doc_end_user/documents/8_San%20Jose/wg11/JCTVC-H0090-v4.zip JCTVC-H0090.doc, (20120201), XP030231961 [I] 8-10 * abstract * * section "1 Introduction" * * section "2 Algorithm description" * [Y] 1-7,11-14 | [IY] - Vivienne Sze ET AL, "High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC)", High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC), Cham, Springer International Publishing, (20140823), doi:10.1007/978-3-319-06895-4_3, ISBN 978-3-319-06894-7, XP055614236 [I] 8-10 * section "5.2.2.5 Merge Estimation Regions for Parallel Merge Mode Estimation", page 127-128 * [Y] 1-7,11-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-06895-4_3 | [XPI] - GAO (HUAWEI) H ET AL, "CE4: Parallel Merge Estimation for VVC (Test 4.3.2)", no. JVET-M0289, (20190102), 13. JVET MEETING; 20190109 - 20190118; MARRAKECH; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/13_Marrakech/wg11/JVET-M0289-v1.zip JVET-M0289_v1.docx, (20190102), XP030200264 [XP] 1,12,14 * abstract * * section "1 Introduction" * * section "2 Problem Statement" * * section "3 Proposed Method" * * subsection "3.1 Solution 1" * * subsection "3.2 Solution 2" * * subsection "3.3 Solution 3" * [I] 2-11,13 | [XPI] - ESENLIK (HUAWEI) S ET AL, "Non-CE4: Parallel Merge Estimation for VVC", no. JVET-L0216, (20181005), 12. JVET MEETING; 20181003 - 20181012; MACAO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/12_Macao/wg11/JVET-L0216-v2.zip JVET-L0216.docx, (20181005), XP030251166 [XP] 1,12,14 * abstract * * section "1 Introduction" * * section "2 Problem Statement" * * section "3 Proposed Method" * * Fig. 3 * [I] 2-11,13 | [XPI] - ESENLIK (HUAWEI) S ET AL, "Non-CE4: Parallel Merge Estimation for VVC", no. JVET-L0216, (20181005), 12. JVET MEETING; 20181003 - 20181012; MACAO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/12_Macao/wg11/JVET-L0216-v2.zip JVET-L0216.pptx, (20181005), XP030251167 [XP] 1,12,14 * page 7 * [I] 2-11,13 |