EP3836173 - REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyosan Electric Mfg. Co., Ltd. 29-1, Heian-cho 2-chome Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0031 / JP | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIKAWA, Satoshi c/o Kyosan Electric Mfg. Co., Ltd. 29-1, Heiancho 2-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0031 / JP | [2023/38] |
Former [2021/24] | 01 /
AIKAWA, Satoshi c/o KYOSAN ELECTRIC MFG. CO., LTD. 29-1, Heiancho 2-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0031 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19847577.4 | 17.07.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019JP28151 | Priority number, date | JP20180147940 | 06.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018147940 | [2021/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020031644 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3836173 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3836173 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01F29/14, H01F37/00 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
H01F27/38 (EP,US);
H01F21/08 (EP,KR,US);
H01F27/2804 (EP);
H01F27/346 (EP);
H01F29/14 (KR,US);
H01F37/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REAKTOR | [2021/24] | English: | REACTOR | [2021/24] | French: | RÉACTEUR | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2021 | Translation filed | 21.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 22.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2023 | CZ | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | IT | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | NL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003229315 (TOHOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0017]; figure 5 *; | [A]JP2016162924 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0005] , [ 0008] , [ 0010] , [ 0021 ] - [ 0023] * * figures 1 - 9 *; | [A]US2017047156 (SAKAMOTO AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0040 ] - [ 0042] - [ 0044 ] - [ 0047] * * figures 3, 4 *; | [A]WO2018056049 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0002] , [ 0012] , [ 0017] ** figure 3 * | International search | [A]JP2003229315 (TOHOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al) [A] 1-7* , *; | [A]JP2016015453 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-7 * , * | by applicant | US6211749 | JP2016015453 |