EP3811603 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING INCOMING CALL AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/44] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Sungwon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Jinki 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/44] |
Former [2021/17] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19848374.5 | 06.08.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019KR09803 | Priority number, date | KR20180092434 | 08.08.2018 Original published format: KR 20180092434 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020032541 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3811603 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3811603 | Date: | 30.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04W4/80, H04M1/60, H04M1/72412, H04M1/72469, H04W68/00, H04W76/15, H04W88/04 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
H04W4/80 (EP);
H04M1/72412 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/6066 (EP);
H04M1/72436 (US);
H04M1/72469 (EP,KR);
H04W4/023 (US);
H04W4/48 (EP,US);
H04W68/005 (US);
H04W68/04 (US);
H04W76/15 (EP);
H04M2201/34 (KR);
H04M2201/36 (KR);
H04M2201/38 (KR);
H04M2250/02 (EP);
H04M2250/04 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES EINGEHENDEN ANRUFS UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DAVON | [2021/17] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING INCOMING CALL AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING THE SAME | [2021/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN APPEL ARRIVANT ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR PRENDRE EN CHARGE LEDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 22.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017237986 (CHOI BOKUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraph [0209] - paragraph [0333]; figure 20 *[I] 9 | International search | [A]US2015350448 (COFFMAN PATRICK L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0134]-[0215] and figures 3-9B. *; | [A]KR101654301B [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0015]-[0076] and figures 1-5. *; | [X]KR20170094745 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0047]-[0286] and figures 5-21e. *; | [A]KR20170096821 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0121] and figures 1-9. *; | [A]KR101834091B [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0033] and figures 1-3. * |