EP3986486 - REMOVABLE ASSEMBLY FOR A DIFFUSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAELIMP 45 rue du Colombier 31670 Labege / FR | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEREZ, Yoann 34 route du Tous 65410 Sarrancolin / FR | 02 /
RIVIERE, Philippe 45 rue Ernest Feydeau 31500 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
PICHON, Philippe 386 chemin de Pouloum 31800 VILLENEUVE-DE-RIVIERE / FR | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Loyer & Abello 9, rue Anatole de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 19848793.6 | 19.12.2019 | [2022/17] | WO2019FR53207 | Priority number, date | WO2019FR51490 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: PCT/FR2019/051490 | [2022/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020254733 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986486 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/12, A01M1/20, A01M29/12, A01M7/00, A61L9/03 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
A61L9/127 (EP);
B05B7/1613 (US);
A01M1/02 (EP,US);
A01M1/2033 (EP);
A01M1/2044 (EP);
A01M1/2072 (EP);
A01M1/2077 (EP,US);
A01M29/12 (EP,US);
A01M7/0003 (EP,US);
A61L9/032 (EP,US);
A61L9/042 (EP);
A61L9/122 (EP);
A61L9/125 (EP);
A61L9/14 (EP,US);
B05B7/22 (US);
A01M1/2061 (EP);
A01M7/0014 (US);
A61L2209/111 (EP,US);
A61L2209/13 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | ABNEHMBARE ANORDNUNG FÜR EINE STREUVORRICHTUNG | [2022/17] | English: | REMOVABLE ASSEMBLY FOR A DIFFUSING APPARATUS | [2022/17] | French: | ENSEMBLE AMOVIBLE POUR UN APPAREIL DIFFUSEUR | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 07.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008124959 (GIVAUDAN SA [CH], et al); | [XAI]US8483553 (TOLLENS FERNANDO RAY [US], et al); | [XAI]US2017072085 (GRUENBACHER DANA PAUL [US], et al); | [XI]US9616149 (IWAKI TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al); | [XI]US2018098573 (YU SHAOYONG [US], et al) | by applicant | US2140516 | US2018000977 |