EP3836995 - VENTING SURGICAL CANNULA FOR PROVIDING GASES TO A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland 2013 / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Christian Francis c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | 02 /
BOYES, Richard John c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | 03 /
ARULANDU, Abigail Sharmini Rajen c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | 04 /
PEGMAN, Benjamin Elliot Hardinge c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | 05 /
GELL, Zane Paul c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | 06 /
BUCKELS, Katie-Ann Jane c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | 07 /
WARNER, Zach Jonathan c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | 08 /
LAUS, Charlotte Grace c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | 09 /
VERDOOLD, Vincent c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19849180.5 | 16.08.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019NZ50099 | Priority number, date | US201862719572P | 17.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862719572 P | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020036497 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3836995 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M13/00, A61B17/34, A61M1/00 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
A61M13/003 (EP,US);
A61M13/006 (EP,AU);
A61B17/3474 (EP,AU,US);
A61B1/00135 (AU);
A61B1/015 (AU);
A61B1/127 (AU);
A61B17/3421 (EP);
A61B17/3462 (EP);
A61B17/3498 (AU);
A61B2218/006 (EP);
A61B2218/008 (EP,AU,US);
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M16/0816 (EP);
A61M16/109 (EP);
A61M16/1095 (EP);
A61M16/16 (EP);
A61M16/202 (EP);
A61M16/209 (EP);
A61M2025/0039 (US);
A61M2039/229 (EP);
A61M2202/0225 (EP,AU);
A61M2205/07 (EP);
A61M2205/3331 (EP);
A61M2205/3334 (EP);
A61M2205/3344 (AU);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,AU);
A61M2205/362 (AU);
A61M2205/3653 (EP,AU);
A61M2205/502 (EP);
A61M2205/75 (EP,AU,US);
A61M2205/7509 (EP);
A61M2205/7518 (EP,AU);
A61M2205/7545 (EP,AU);
A61M2206/14 (AU);
A61M2206/16 (AU);
A61M2210/1017 (EP,AU);
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0225, A61M2202/0007, A61M2202/0014 (AU);
A61M2202/02, A61M2202/0014 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE ENTLÜFTUNGSKANÜLE ZUR VERSORGUNG EINES PATIENTEN MIT GASEN | [2021/25] | English: | VENTING SURGICAL CANNULA FOR PROVIDING GASES TO A PATIENT | [2021/25] | French: | CANULE CHIRURGICALE D'ÉVACUATION POUR FOURNIR DES GAZ À UN PATIENT | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 21.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2279704 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]); | [XYI]US2011125084 (STEARNS RALPH [US], et al); | [XY]US2017007295 (GEISZ CARL M [US]); | [A]US2018228510 (HOLSTEN HENRY [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2002128603 (BOOTH CHARLES S [US], et al) [Y] 58* Fig. 1-2, 7-9; Para [0068] *; | [X]US2012165610 (POLL WAYNE L [US], et al) [X] 1, 4-6, 9-10, 14-17, 19, 27- 30 * Fig. 1A-1B; Para [0046], [0075] *; | [X]US9295490 (STEARNS RALPH [US], et al) [X] 1-36, 42-45, 47, 51-52, 55- 56 * Fig. 1-2, 8B, 10, 14, 27; Col. 10-11, 17 *; | [X]US2017319268 (AKAGANE TSUNETAKA [JP]) [X] 1-8, 10-19, 27-30, 51-52, 55- 56 * Fig. 1, 3; Para [0023]-[0026], [0045], [0066] *; | [XY]US2018228510 (HOLSTEN HENRY [US], et al) [X] 1-43, 45-52, 55-56 * Fig. 1-16; Para [0059]-[0079] Fig. 10-11 * [Y] 58 | by applicant | US2011125084 | US9295490 | US2017007295 | US2017319268 |