EP3830550 - DEVICE FOR OPTICALLY ANALYZING FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/23] | DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR OPTICALLY ANALYZING FOOD PRODUCTS | ||
[2022/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P&P Optica Inc. 680-A Davenport Road Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2C3 / CA | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IYER, Krishna 218 King St S. Waterloo, Ontario N2J1R3 / CA | 02 /
PAWLUCZYK, Olga Ewa 680-A Davenport Road Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2C3 / CA | 03 /
OLDENBURG, Bradley 608 Yarmouth Drive Waterloo, Ontario N2K 4C1 / CA | 04 /
GUTHRIE, Simon 680A Davenport Rd Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2C3 / CA | 05 /
STORK, Timothy M.F. E2-70 Willow Run Drive Kitchener, Ontario N2A 0J3 / CA | 06 /
OSIKA, Ewa 1515 Dickie Settlement Road Cambridge, Ontario N3H 4R8 / CA | 07 /
LIZIUS, David William 3 Birch Street Guelph, Ontario N1G 2N2 / CA | 08 /
PAWLUCZYK, Romuald 280 Golf Course Road Conestogo, Ontario N0B 1N0 / CA | 09 /
SHAW, Anthony Robert 451 Kelso Drive Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2S2 / CA | 10 /
BARAN-HARPER, Alexander 308-271 Eiwo Court Waterloo, Ontario N2K 2M8 / CA | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Schulz Junghans Patentanwälte PartGmbB Großbeerenstraße 71 10963 Berlin / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19849351.2 | 14.08.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019IB56917 | Priority number, date | US201815998434 | 15.08.2018 Original published format: US201815998434 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035813 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830550 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3830550 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 20.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/31, G01N21/88, G01N33/02, G01J3/02, G01J3/10, G01J3/36, A22C17/00, B07C5/342, // G01N21/17, G01N21/84, G01N21/94, B07C5/00 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
G01N33/02 (EP,US);
A22C17/008 (EP);
B07C5/342 (EP);
G01J3/0202 (EP);
G01J3/0205 (EP);
G01J3/0286 (EP);
G01J3/0289 (EP);
G01J3/0291 (EP);
G01J3/10 (EP);
G01J3/36 (EP);
G01N21/251 (US);
G01N21/31 (EP);
G01N21/3563 (US);
G01N21/88 (US);
G01N21/8806 (EP);
B07C2501/0081 (EP);
G01N2021/1765 (EP,US);
G01N2021/1774 (EP);
G01N2021/3155 (EP);
G01N2021/845 (EP,US);
G01N21/94 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | G01N21/31, G01N21/88, G01J3/02, G01J3/10, G01J3/36, G01N33/02, A22C17/00, // G01N21/17, G01N21/84, G01N21/94, B07C5/342 | ||
Former IPC [2021/23] | G01N21/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTISCHEN ANALYSE VON LEBENSMITTELPRODUKTEN | [2022/46] | English: | DEVICE FOR OPTICALLY ANALYZING FOOD PRODUCTS | [2022/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE OPTIQUE DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [2022/46] |
Former [2021/23] | VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR OPTISCHEN ANALYSE VON LEBENSMITTELPRODUKTEN | ||
Former [2021/23] | DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR OPTICALLY ANALYZING FOOD PRODUCTS | ||
Former [2021/23] | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME D'ANALYSE OPTIQUE DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 28.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | MC | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | IE | 14.08.2023 | LU | 14.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
LU | 14.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
LU | 14.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
LU | 14.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
PT | 14.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9428397 (AXIOM BILDVERARBEIT SYST [DE], et al) [Y] 8-15 * page 36, line 22 - page 42, line 17; figures 10A,10B,11,12 *; | [XYI]US2002008055 (CAMPBELL DUNCAN B [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0002] , [0019] , [0035] , [0037] , [0050] - [0055] - [0075] - [0076] - [0097] - [0101]; figures 5, 10,18,19,20 * [Y] 8-15 [I] 4-7; | [Y]JP2015014511 (LION ENG KK) [Y] 11,14* paragraphs [0072] , [0073]; figure 1 *; | [A] - PEILIN LI ET AL, "Study on citrus fruit image using fisher linear discriminant analysis", COMPUTER SCIENCE AND AUTOMATION ENGINEERING (CSAE), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110610), doi:10.1109/CSAE.2011.5952828, ISBN 978-1-4244-8727-1, pages 175 - 180, XP031894407 [A] 1 * page 176, column r, paragraph A; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CSAE.2011.5952828 | International search | [A]US6587575 (WINDHAM WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-16* ? entire document ? *; | [A]US2009080706 (TAO YANG [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * ? entire document ? *; | [A]US2018027848 (BLAINE GEORGE R [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * ? entire document ? * | by applicant | US2002008055 |