EP3831054 - REFERENCE PICTURE MANAGEMENT IN VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Guangdong Province Shenzhen 518129 / CN | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Ye-Kui 6264 Sunrose Crest Way San Diego, California 92130 / US | 02 /
HENDRY, Fnu 8584 Foxcroft Place San Diego, California 92129 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Roth, Sebastian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19849559.0 | 16.08.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US46928 | Priority number, date | US201862719360P | 17.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862719360 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020037273 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3831054 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/58, H04N19/70, H04N19/105, H04N19/174, H04N19/176 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
H04N19/58 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
H04N19/44 (CN,IL,US);
H04N19/159 (CN,IL,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G06T1/60 (IL,US);
H04N19/174 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,CN,IL,US);
H04N19/184 (IL);
H04N19/46 (IL,US);
H04N19/463 (IL);
H04N19/467 (IL);
H04N19/70 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | REFERENZBILDVERWALTUNG IN DER VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2021/23] | English: | REFERENCE PICTURE MANAGEMENT IN VIDEO CODING | [2021/23] | French: | GESTION D'IMAGES DE RÉFÉRENCE DANS UN CODAGE VIDÉO | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 14.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.07.2024 | 02.07.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013155184 (CHEN YING [US], et al); | [A]US2013215975 (SAMUELSSON JONATAN [SE], et al); | [XA]US2014086324 (RAMASUBRAMONIAN ADARSH KRISHNAN [US], et al); | [A]US2017094270 (ZHAO JIE [US], et al) |