EP3837834 - AN APPARATUS, A METHOD AND A COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR VIEWING VOLUME SIGNALLING FOR VOLUMETRIC VIDEO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALAMAL VADAKITAL, Vinod Kumar Insinöörinkatu 54 B 38 33720 Tampere / FI | 02 /
ROIMELA, Kimmo Annalankatu 17 C 9 33710 Tampere / FI | 03 /
PYSTYNEN, Johannes Manninkuja 3 33870 Tampere / FI | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 19850122.3 | 13.08.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019FI50585 | Priority number, date | FI20180005679 | 13.08.2018 Original published format: FI 20185679 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035633 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837834 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 20.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/172, H04N19/597, G06F3/01, G06T19/00, H04N19/46, G06T17/10, H04N21/81, H04N21/854, H04N21/84, H04N21/845, H04N21/235, H04N21/435, H04N21/234, H04N21/44, H04N21/218 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
H04N13/388 (US);
G02B27/017 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
H04N13/172 (EP);
H04N13/189 (EP);
H04N13/194 (EP);
H04N13/275 (EP);
H04N19/597 (EP);
H04N19/70 (EP);
H04N21/21805 (EP);
H04N21/23412 (EP);
H04N21/2353 (EP);
H04N21/435 (EP);
H04N21/44012 (EP);
H04N21/816 (EP);
H04N21/84 (EP);
H04N21/845 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/25] | H04N13/172, H04N19/597, G06F3/01, G06T19/00, H04N19/46, G06T17/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUR BETRACHTUNG DER VOLUMENSIGNALISIERUNG FÜR EIN VOLUMETRISCHES VIDEO | [2021/25] | English: | AN APPARATUS, A METHOD AND A COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR VIEWING VOLUME SIGNALLING FOR VOLUMETRIC VIDEO | [2021/25] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR PERMETTANT DE VISUALISER LA SIGNALISATION DE VOLUME DESTINÉE À UNE VIDÉO VOLUMÉTRIQUE | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 01.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005123171 (KOBAYASHI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] * * figure 4 *; | [A]US2011202510 (SALEMANN LEO [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0089] * * figures 5,6 *; | [I]US2017244948 (PANG DEREK [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0130] * * paragraph [0285] *; | [I] - SACHIN DESHPANDE (SHARP) ET AL, "[OMAF] On Viewing Space Signaling", no. m43369, (20180705), 123. MPEG MEETING; 20180716 - 20180720; LJUBLJANA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/123_Ljubljana/wg11/m43369-v1-m43369_On_Viewing_Space.zip m43369_On Viewing Space.docx, (20180705), XP030196034 [I] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 2.1 - page 4, paragraph 3.1.1 * * page 5, paragraph 3.1.2 - page 6, paragraph 3.2.1.1 * * figure 1 * | [A] - RALF SCHAFER ET AL, "Review and Future Directions for 3D-Video", 25. PICTURE CODING SYMPOSIUM;24-4-2006 - 26-4-2006; BEIJING,, (20060424), XP030080206 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, column 2 - page 4, column 1 * * page 6, column 1 * * figures 2,4 * | [A] - MARY-LUC CHAMPEL ET AL, "PDTR of MPEG-I part 1 on Architectures for Immersive Media", no. m41907, (20171026), 120. MPEG MEETING; 20171023 - 20171027; MACAU; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/120_Macau/wg11/m41907-v1-PDTRofMPEG-Ipart1TechnicalReportonArchitecturesforImmersiveMedia_v1.zip PDTR of MPEG-I part 1 Technical Report on Architectures for Immersive Media_v1.docx, (20171026), XP030070249 [A] 1-15 * page 3 - page 4 * * page 6 * * page 35 * * figure 4 * | [A] - D. Vlasenko, "Constructive solid geometry", Wikipedia, (20180511), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Constructive_solid_geometry&oldid=840660750, (20200414), XP055685139 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2004105573 (NEUMANN ULRICH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038]-[0062] *; | [X]US2005123171 (KOBAYASHI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1, 7-10, 13-15 * paragraphs [0002], [0038]-[0039], [0074]-[0075], [0077], [0082]-[0083]; Figs. 7-8, 11-12 *; | [X]US2009185719 (ERIGNAC CHARLES A [US]) [X] 1, 7-10, 14-15 * abstract; paragraphs [0017]-[0019], [0048], [0062]; Figs. 4a-4d *; | [X]US2016253842 (SHAPIRA LIOR [US], et al) [X] 10, 14-15 * abstract; paragraphs [0063]-[0064], [0074]; Fig. 2 *; | [XY] - DESHPANDE, S. et al., "On Viewing Space Signaling", MPEG Document Management System. 123rd meeting of MPEG, Ljubljana, Slovenia, (20180700), URL: http://wg11.sc29.org, (20191126), XP030196034 [X] 1, 8-10, 13-15 * sections 2.1.1, 2.1.2.3, 2.2, 3.2-3.4; Fig. 1 Ibid. * [Y] 2-7, 11-12 | [Y] - VLASENKO, D. et al., "Constructive solid geometry. Wikipedia- article", Wikimedia Foundation, (20180511), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Constructive_solid_geometry&oldid=840660750, (20191202), XP055685139 [Y] 2-7, 11-12 * the whole document * | [T] - ROIMELA, K. et al., "Generalized viewing space signalling for Immersive Video", MPEG Document Management System. 128th meeting of MPEG, Geneva, Switzerland, (20191000), URL: http://wg11.sc29.org, (20191129), XP030221804 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2005123171 | US2017244948 |