EP3768698 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING TUMOR SUPPRESSOR GENE THERAPY AND CD122/CD132 AGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MultiVir Inc. 2 Houston Center 909 Fannin St., Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77010-1028 / US | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOBOL, Robert, E. 7070 El Vuelo Del Este Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | 02 /
MENANDER, Kerstin, B. 4813 Valerie Street Bellaire, TX 77401 / US | 03 /
WIEDERHOLD, Dora 6189 Derby Court League City, TX 77573 / US | 04 /
CHADA, Sunil C/o MULTIVIR INC. 909 Fannin, Suite 2100 2 Houston Center Houston, TX 77010-1028 / US | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons LLP (Munich), et al Lehel Carré Thierschplatz 6 80538 Munich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Nottrott, Stephanie Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Seckenheimer Landstr. 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 19850329.4 | 19.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019US22985 | Priority number, date | US201862645022P | 19.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862645022 P | US201962803887P | 11.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962803887 P | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020036635 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3768698 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C07K14/54, C12N15/86, C07K16/28, A61K35/76, A61K39/395, A61K38/20, A61K38/17, A61P35/00, A61K35/761, A61K35/768, C07K14/55, C07K14/705, C07K14/715 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
A61K35/768 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/20 (EP,KR);
C07K14/4746 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/761 (EP,KR);
A61K35/763 (KR);
A61K38/1758 (KR);
A61K38/1793 (EP);
A61K38/2013 (EP,KR);
A61K38/2086 (EP,KR);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61K48/005 (KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/54 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/5443 (EP,KR);
C07K14/55 (EP,KR);
C07K14/70596 (EP);
C07K14/7155 (EP,KR);
C12N15/86 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
A61K39/39541 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (US);
C07K16/2818 (EP);
C07K2319/30 (EP,KR);
C12N2710/10343 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39541, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | C07K14/47, C07K14/54, C12N15/86 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT TUMORSUPPRESSORGENTHERAPIE UND CD122/CD132-AGONISTEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2021/04] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING TUMOR SUPPRESSOR GENE THERAPY AND CD122/CD132 AGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2021/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT UNE THÉRAPIE GÉNIQUE SUPPRESSIVE DE TUMEUR ET DES AGONISTES DE CD122/CD132 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 06.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017312351 (NIAZI KAYVAN [US], et al); | [XP]WO2018234862 (MEDICENNA THERAPEUTICS INC [CA]); | International search | [Y]EP2522726 (FUNDACIO PRIVADA CT DE REGULACIO GENOMICA CRG [ES]); | [Y]US2015072988 (CARDUCCI MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2017044229 (GARCIA CHRISTOPHER K [US], et al); | [Y]WO2017079746 (MULTIVIR INC [US]); | [Y]US2017151310 (FELBER BARBARA K [US], et al) | by applicant | US4682195 | US4683202 | EP0266032 | US4797368 | US4835251 | US5023321 | US5139941 | US5302523 | WO9409699 | US5322783 | WO9501994 | US5384253 | WO9506128 | US5399363 | WO9511986 | US5464765 | US5466468 | US5538877 | US5538880 | US5543158 | US5550318 | US5563055 | US5580859 | US5589466 | US5591616 | US5610042 | US5641515 | US5645897 | US5656610 | US5702932 | US5705629 | WO9807408 | US5736524 | US5736167 | US5739169 | US5780448 | US5789215 | US5801005 | US5811395 | WO9842752 | US5821337 | US5824311 | US5830880 | US5844905 | US5846233 | US5846225 | US5846945 | US5885796 | US5925565 | US5928906 | US5935819 | US5945100 | US5981274 | US5994136 | US5994624 | US6013516 | WO0037504 | WO0114424 | US6207156 | US6740320 | WO2004058801 | WO2005003168 | WO2005009465 | WO2006003179 | US7060808 | WO2006072625 | WO2006072626 | US2006257361 | WO2006121168 | WO2007042573 | US7223593 | US2007160578 | WO2008084106 | WO2008132601 | WO2009044273 | US7537924 | WO2009101611 | US7589069 | WO2009114335 | WO2010027827 | WO2010065939 | US2011008369 | WO2011014438 | US2011039778 | EP2320940 | WO2011066342 | US2011190319 | US8008449 | US8017114 | US8067567 | EP2403951 | WO2012009703 | US8119129 | WO2012062748 | WO2012071411 | US2012177645 | WO2012146667 | US2012294796 | WO2012160448 | US8329867 | WO2013006490 | US8354509 | WO2013025779 | WO2013067492 | US2014022021 | WO2014047350 | EP2724728 | US8735553 | WO2014100014 | WO2014138314 | US2014294898 | WO2014164942 | WO2015016718 | WO2015027163 | WO2015082376 | US2015202290 | WO2015150809 | US2015291595 | WO2016009017 | US2017044229 | WO2017079746 | US2017183403 | US9746471 | US2017312351 | US20180601358 | US20160601331 | WO2011KR04693 | WO2015GB51023 | WO2016US60833 | WO2017US65861 |